This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/22/2022 at 16:03:19 (UTC).

Alcantar, Pedro, Alcantar, Pedro JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Alcantar, Pedro, Alcantar, Pedro JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2005

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Alcantar, Pedro JR

Alcantar, Pedro

Alcantar, Pedro Junior

Junior,

Monster,

Porky,

Pork Chop,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Flory, Mike

Corrigan, Katherine

Morrison, Michael

Marley, Michael

Burchell, Colby Harold

Bodley, Cliff

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: H1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: H13; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: H13; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: H13; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: H13; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H13; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H13; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H13; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: H13; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: H1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 7; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 32310(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Manufacture, sale, or receipt of large-capacity magazine prohibited; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 6; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 30305(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Prohibited person own ammunition; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 5; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 25400(a)(1)/(c)(6) PC; OL: F; Violation: Concealed loaded un-registered firearm in vehicle; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 4; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 25400(a)(1)/(c)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Convicted felon carrying concealed firearm in vehicle; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 3; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 29800(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Possession of firearm by a felon; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 1; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 12022.5(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH-Personally using firearm; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 245(b) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with semiautomatic firearm; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 1; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 12022.5(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH-Personally using firearm; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 11/05/2021; Section Statute: 245(d)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with firearm on peace officer/firefighter; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Porky, is a litigant

Latest cases where JUNIOR is a litigant

Latest cases where MONSTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bodley, Cliff