This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 21:40:06 (UTC).

Aguirre, Omar, Aguirre, Omar Gerardo Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Aguirre, Omar, Aguirre, Omar Gerardo was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2441

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Aguirre, Omar Gerardo

Aguirre, Omar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kim, Jenny

Dorn, J

Deputy Public Defender,

Flory, Mike

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C54; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Mandatory Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C50; Hearing Status: Cancel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 09/09/2020; Section Statute: 11364(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of controlled substance paraphernalia; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 09/09/2020; Section Statute: 11377(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dorn, Jessica

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kim, Jenny

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Flory, Mike