This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/10/2023 at 14:48:54 (UTC).

Aguilar, Jorge, Middleside, Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2022 Aguilar, Jorge, Middleside, was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3455

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Aguilar, Jorge

Middleside,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Hernandez, Mike

Deputy Public Defender,

Moorhead, Jay

Caress, Marc

Kurdi, Omar

Gossett-Ornelas, Alyssa

Gonzalez, Celeste

Silverman, Lorri

Mongrut, Pedro

Chang, Sarah

Harrington, Caitlin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Jury Trial -; Courtroom: C5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: C29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: C29; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: C5; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C5; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment -; Courtroom: C5; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Hearing Bail Review; Courtroom: C58; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial -; Courtroom: C58; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: C49; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/10/2022; Section Statute: 11377(a) HS; OL: M; Violation: Possession of a controlled substance; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 2; Violation Date: 12/10/2022; Section Statute: 12022.1(b) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH-Secondary offense committed while released from custody; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 1; Violation Date: 12/10/2022; Section Statute: 12022.7(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: ENH-Inflict great bodily injury; Plea: DENIED; Plea Date: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/10/2022; Section Statute: 245(a)(1) PC; OL: F; Violation: Assault with deadly weapon other than firearm; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less