This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 19:18:47 (UTC).

Abbott, Kaela, Abbott, Kaela Suzette Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Abbott, Kaela, Abbott, Kaela Suzette was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3401

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Abbott, Kaela Suzette

Abbott, Kaela

Abbott, Kayla

Abbott, Satia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Deputy Public Defender,

Volk, Lawrence

Cotton, Lance

Ordonez, Jose Don

Campbell, Andrea

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • SentenceSent Seq #: 1; Type: INFORMAL; Term: 1 years; Status; History; Status: Active; Status Date: 12/16/2022; End Date: 12/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Preliminary Hearing -; Courtroom: W12; Hearing Status: Cancel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Pre Trial Settlement Conference; Courtroom: W11; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Statement of Assets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: Restitution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 100 hours Community Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • SentenceCount: 1; Sentence: 1 years Probation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type - Reason: Arraignment In Custody; Courtroom: CJ1; Hearing Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSeq: 2; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/05/2022; Section Statute: 496d(a) PC; OL: F; Violation: Buying or receiving stolen vehicle or equipment; Plea: NOT GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/07/2022; Disposition: Dismissed; Dispo Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSeq: 1; S/A: 0; Violation Date: 12/05/2022; Section Statute: 10851(a) VC; OL: M; Violation: Unlawful taking of vehicle; Plea: GUILTY; Plea Date: 12/16/2022; Disposition: Pled Guilty; Dispo Date: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less