This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/28/2016 at 10:59:00 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE VS VANHOWE

Case Summary

On 01/19/2006 WORLDWIDE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANHOWE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0217

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

HOLDEN F VANHOWE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 03/13/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 03/13/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10353914 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10177788.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10353914 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10177788.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 10/08/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 10/08/2009

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 06/02/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 06/02/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10491481.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10491481.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 12/29/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 12/29/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 05/23/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 05/23/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 05/23/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 12/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10491481.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2010
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 06/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 10/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10353914 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10177788.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 07/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 07/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 07/07/2006 AT 13:30:00 IN HNB AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 07/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 06/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 05/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 04/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC ON 01/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less