This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/15/2016 at 04:39:03 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE V ERDELAC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2006 WORLDWIDE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ERDELAC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1192

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC

Defendant

KATY ERDELAC

Assignee

GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC ON 07/05/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC ON 07/05/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11989582 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11813671.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11989582 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11813671.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/27/16) RECEIVED ON 06/24/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/27/16) RECEIVED ON 06/24/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC ON 06/24/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC ON 06/24/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 12/29/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 12/29/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 10/09/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 10/09/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10034257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 58670.

PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10034257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 58670.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC ON 07/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3431367 RECEIVED ON 07/05/2016 09:48:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11989582 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11813671.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/27/16) RECEIVED ON 06/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GALAXY PORTFOLIOS, LLC ON 06/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3428670 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2016 04:51:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2006
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 06/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 03/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 03/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC ON 03/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.