This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/14/2016 at 09:45:37 (UTC).

WHITE VS POPULAR

Case Summary

On 03/03/2006 WHITE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against POPULAR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0925

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A

WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION

Defendants

MICHAEL HAROLD SHARP

POPULAR PAVER RENTAL

SFU, INC.

SFU, INC., A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLIE AND SCHUSTER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO FILING PARTY

NOTICE TO FILING PARTY

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 03/03/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 03/03/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10065811 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 90196.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10065811 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 90196.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 04/02/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 04/02/2009

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 04/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10065811 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 90196.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2008
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 03/03/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO FILING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 03/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2007
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED ON 03/16/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 07/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 06/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • MEMORANDUM FOR SETTING FOR HEARING (MEMO TO SET CASE FOR HEARING) WAS FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 05/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 05/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 04/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED ON 04/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 04/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED ON 04/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 03/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION ON 03/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITE CAP CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY, INC., A CORPORATION is a litigant