This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/16/2016 at 11:33:09 (UTC).

WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. VS. HIGHLAND ENGINEERING, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2008 WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against HIGHLAND ENGINEERING, L L C. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC.

Defendants

CLAY L. BLAIR

JOHN T. LACY

HIGHLAND ENGINEERING, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMAN A. KOSTENKO

Defendant Attorney

WATT TIEDER HOFFAR & FITZGERALD, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 10/15/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 10/15/2008

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 10/09/2008

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 10/09/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10226784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10050659.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10226784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10050659.

STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT JOHN T. LACY AKA TOM LACY

STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT JOHN T. LACY AKA TOM LACY

ORDER GRANTING FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 09/30/2008

ORDER GRANTING FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 09/30/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO VACATE 09/22/2008 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO VACATE 09/22/2008 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10196149 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10020024.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10196149 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10020024.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10184708 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10008573.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10184708 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10008573.

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ROMAN A. KOSTENKO IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE HRG 7/16/08) FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 07/16/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ROMAN A. KOSTENKO IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE HRG 7/16/08) FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 07/16/2008

OPPOSITION (TO EX PARTE TO SET ASIDE ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT & ENFORCE STAY) FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 07/16/2008

OPPOSITION (TO EX PARTE TO SET ASIDE ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT & ENFORCE STAY) FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 07/16/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/16/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/16/2008 09:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE) FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 07/15/2008

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE) FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 07/15/2008

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF BRENT N. MACKAY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE) FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 07/15/2008

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF BRENT N. MACKAY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE) FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 07/15/2008

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO SET ASIDE ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT AND ENFORCE STAY) FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 07/15/2008

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO SET ASIDE ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT AND ENFORCE STAY) FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 07/15/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10158694 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 183060.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10158694 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 183060.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10143650 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 168016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10143650 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 168016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 09 - MOTION TO VACATE - SMALL CLAIMS IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10141864 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 166230.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 09 - MOTION TO VACATE - SMALL CLAIMS IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10141864 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 166230.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2008
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT) FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 10/17/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 10/15/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 10/09/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10226784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10050659.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT JOHN T. LACY AKA TOM LACY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 09/30/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO VACATE 09/22/2008 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10196149 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10020024.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 09 - MOTION TO VACATE - SMALL CLAIMS IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10141864 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 166230.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE (JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE) FILED BY LACY, JOHN T. ON 06/19/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT REJECTED: ITEM 10: PLEASE LEAVE BLANK (2ND REQUEST). (BY COMPLETING THIS AREA AS SHOWN WESTERN REFINING IS IN EFFECT PUTTING A LIEN ON THEIR OWN JUDGMENT. THIS IS ONLY FOR WHEN THERE IS AN ATTACHMENT LIEN PLACED ON THEIR JUDGMENT BY THEIR CREDITOR.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REJECTED ABSTRACT. NO RECORD OF 'ATTACHMENT LIEN' AS STATED IN #10. PLEASE PROVIDE COPY OR REMOVE FROM ABSTRACT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 05/20/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10105934 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 130301.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 04/30/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN REFINING WHOLESALE, INC. ON 04/30/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less