This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/01/2016 at 02:43:44 (UTC).

WANG VS CARTER

Case Summary

On 01/17/2001 WANG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARTER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0294

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUGLAS WANG

Defendants

ALONZO TATE

JESSICA B. CARTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4560642 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4560642 REJECTED.

ORDER - OTHER (ASSIGNMENT) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 07/08/2016

ORDER - OTHER (ASSIGNMENT) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 07/08/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 07/08/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 07/08/2016 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11983708 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11807793.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11983708 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11807793.

MOTION - OTHER (FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 06/10/2016

MOTION - OTHER (FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 06/10/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 03/01/2016

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 03/01/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11908108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11732325.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11908108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11732325.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM (JP MORGAN CHASE BANK) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 01/19/2016

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR THIRD PARTY EXAM (JP MORGAN CHASE BANK) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 01/19/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11847847 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11672095.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11847847 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11672095.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 9-15-15) RECEIVED ON 09/11/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 9-15-15) RECEIVED ON 09/11/2015.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 09/11/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 09/11/2015

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (RENEWAL) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 02/16/2011

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (RENEWAL) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 02/16/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10831181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10655073.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10831181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10655073.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 01/10/2011

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 01/10/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 01/10/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 01/10/2011

BENCH WARRANT FILED BY CREDITOR'S ATTORNEY, STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN - REJECTED AND RETURNED

BENCH WARRANT FILED BY CREDITOR'S ATTORNEY, STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN - REJECTED AND RETURNED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4560642 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ASSIGNMENT) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 07/08/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 07/08/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketMOTION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11983708 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11807793.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - OTHER (FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER) FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 06/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4560643 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2016 05:27:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PARTY 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 03/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2001
  • DocketFEE WAIVER ORDER GRANTED FOR JESSCIA CARTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketCARTER, JESSICA B. APPLICATION FOR WAIVER GRANTED IN WHOLE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2001
  • DocketFEE WAIVER ORDER GRANTED FOR ALONZO TALE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketTATE, ALONZO APPLICATION FOR WAIVER GRANTED IN WHOLE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2008
  • DocketTATE, ALONZO APPLICATION FOR WAIVER GRANTED IN WHOLE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2008
  • DocketAPPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 08/19/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN W01 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10148067 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 172433.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS ON 06/27/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY WANG, DOUGLAS; CARTER, JESSICA B.; TATE, ALONZO ON 06/27/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D. Silverstein