This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 08:06:34 (UTC).

WALSH VS O'ROURKE

Case Summary

On 01/27/2003 WALSH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against O'ROURKE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0576

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALSH & ASSOCIATES

Defendant

ED O'ROURKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALSH & WALSH, P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2004
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 05/20/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2004
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 05/20/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY WALSH & ASSOCIATES ON 05/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY WALSH & ASSOCIATES ON 05/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY WALSH & ASSOCIATES ON 05/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 05/05/2004 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 05/05/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 02/25/2004 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 02/25/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 01/06/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2004
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY WALSH & ASSOCIATES ON 01/06/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2004
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY WALSH & ASSOCIATES ON 01/06/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY WALSH & ASSOCIATES ON 01/06/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 01/06/2004 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2003
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 10/23/2003 AT 08:30:00 IN CJC AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 10/23/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/27/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walsh & Associated, APC is a litigant