This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/28/2017 at 09:11:44 (UTC).

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. VS. MOUNTAINVIEW, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/22/2009 USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOUNTAINVIEW, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, IN

Defendant

MOUNTAINVIEW, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES C BECHL

WAYNE HUNKINS

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J HARTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/03/2015; Filing Party: USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 02/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11253817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11077709.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • WRIT UPDATED ON 10/25/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 10/30/2012; Filing Party: USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 10/30/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • WRIT UPDATED ON 05/11/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 10/26/2012; Filing Party: USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 10/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11251291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11075183.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • WRIT UPDATED ON 05/11/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2009
  • DISPOSITION FOR MOUNTAINVIEW, LLC ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO SCHEDULED FOR 12/10/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 10 - APPEAL OF SMALL CLAIMS CASE IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10504122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10327995.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY MOUNTAINVIEW, LLC ON 11/03/2009; Filing Party: MOUNTAINVIEW, LLC ON 11/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/09/2009 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 09/14/2009; Filing Party: USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 09/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10428902 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10252776.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/09/2009 AT 08:00:00 AM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 07/22/2009; Filing Party: USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. ON 07/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC is a litigant