This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/23/2016 at 02:54:03 (UTC).

UNIFUND VS PERRAH

Case Summary

On 07/25/2006 UNIFUND filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERRAH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3153

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS

Defendant

GREGG M PERRAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CIR LAW OFFICES

LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

Defendant Attorney

CIR, LAW OFFICES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/27/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11996754 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11820837.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11996754 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11820837.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 07/11/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 07/11/2016

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 7/12/16) RECEIVED ON 07/11/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 7/12/16) RECEIVED ON 07/11/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 07/11/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 07/11/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 10/05/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 10/05/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 10/16/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 10/16/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11500098 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11323897.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11500098 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11323897.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/21/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/14/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/21/2013) RECEIVED ON 11/14/2013.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS; UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 11/14/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS; UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 11/14/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 03/18/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 03/18/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11170605 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10994497.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11170605 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10994497.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 06/19/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 06/19/2012

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 11/10/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 11/10/2008

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4611708 RECEIVED ON 09/27/2016 06:56:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11996754 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11820837.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 07/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 7/12/16) RECEIVED ON 07/11/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 07/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4573689 RECEIVED ON 07/11/2016 10:30:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 10/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2412395 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2015 12:02:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 10/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 11/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 11/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 11/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 11/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 10/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 07/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 07/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 07/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.