This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/03/2016 at 09:29:56 (UTC).

UNIFUND V RIDLEY

Case Summary

On 12/27/2006 UNIFUND filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIDLEY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5994

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALIS

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC

Defendant

MOSES R RIDLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN A BOOSKA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED (NO WRIT) FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 06/12/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED (NO WRIT) FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 06/12/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 05/21/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 05/21/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (CCP 706.026) FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 03/04/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (CCP 706.026) FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 03/04/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10313108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10136983.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10313108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10136983.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL. CERTIFIED COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL. CERTIFIED COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 01/22/2009

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 01/22/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 01/22/2009 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 01/22/2009 09:30:00 AM.

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 01/07/2009

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 01/07/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10274702 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10098577.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10274702 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10098577.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 12/24/2008

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 12/24/2008

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 12/24/2008

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 12/24/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10212212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10036087.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10212212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10036087.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 09/24/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 09/24/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 02/20/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 02/20/2008

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED (NO WRIT) FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 06/12/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 05/21/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (CCP 706.026) FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 03/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10313108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10136983.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF MINUTE ORDER AND ORDER DETERMINING MAILED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL. CERTIFIED COPY OF MINUTE ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 01/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 01/22/2009 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 01/07/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 06/06/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 06/06/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 06/06/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 05/31/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 05/29/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 05/15/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 01/26/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/02/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS, LLC ON 12/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less