This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 05:01:13 (UTC).

UNIFUND V LOUDON

Case Summary

On 08/25/2006 UNIFUND filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOUDON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3847

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTI

UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC

Defendant

REBECCA F LOUDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMITH AND HULL, A.P.C.

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION-REJECTED

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION-REJECTED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 06/02/2009

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 06/02/2009

ACKNOWLEGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT REJECTED

ACKNOWLEGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT REJECTED

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT REJECTED

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT REJECTED

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 11/05/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 11/05/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10182074 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10005939.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10182074 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10005939.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 08/14/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 08/14/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION-REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 06/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 11/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10182074 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10005939.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY AGAINST DEFENDANT REBECCA F. LOUDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 08/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 04/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2007
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 01/08/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 01/08/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 01/08/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 01/08/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 12/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 09/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 08/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ON 08/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/25/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.