This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 05:30:25 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS VS LEQUANG

Case Summary

On 08/18/2005 UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEQUANG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4580

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS

Defendant

JACKY T LEQUANG

Assignee

PMGI, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKY T LEQUANG

KENOSIAN & MIELE

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/24/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/24/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11665875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11490013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11665875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11490013.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/24/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/24/2014

WRIT (ISSUED 9/25/14) RECEIVED ON 09/24/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 9/25/14) RECEIVED ON 09/24/2014.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 08/07/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 08/07/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 08/07/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 08/07/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PMGI, LLC ON 07/16/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PMGI, LLC ON 07/16/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 7/17/14) RECEIVED ON 07/16/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 7/17/14) RECEIVED ON 07/16/2014.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PMGI, LLC ON 07/16/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PMGI, LLC ON 07/16/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 12/30/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 12/30/2013

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 05/07/2012

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 05/07/2012

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS REJECTED ON 04/06/2012.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS REJECTED ON 04/06/2012.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10919483 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10743375.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10919483 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10743375.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 01/31/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 01/31/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10482074.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10482074.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 05/10/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 05/10/2010

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/03/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/03/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10315186 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10139061.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10315186 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10139061.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4330757 RECEIVED ON 02/19/2015 09:42:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11665875 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11490013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 09/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 9/25/14) RECEIVED ON 09/24/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1192938 RECEIVED ON 09/24/2014 10:52:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 08/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 08/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4229056 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2014 02:36:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 04/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 04/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (NOTICE OF HEARING) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 03/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 03/02/2006 AT 13:30:00 IN WJC AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 03/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 02/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 01/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2005
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 12/16/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ON 08/18/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 08/18/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PMGI LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, G.P. is a litigant