Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/18/2016 at 03:05:24 (UTC).

TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH VS JACK TRACY CONSTRU

Case Summary

On 06/20/2006 TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JACK TRACY CONSTRU. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7292

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

SYNOD OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA AND HAWAI

PRESBYTERY OF LOS RANCHOS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CLAREMONT LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY

GOLDEN BEAR INSURANCE COMPANY

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

DE PLAYA EXTERIORS INC

RANGER INSURANCE COMPANY

JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CLEAR WATER PLUMBING AND SUPPLY INC

JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC

Cross Defendants

FAITHCO INC

JE EAGLE BUILDERS

SAN DIEGO MICHELANGELO STONE AND TILE

PCH SHEET METAL & AIR CONDITIONING INC

ELITE ROOFING ASSOCIATES INC

JOHN VANDERGEEST LANDSCAPE INC

CLEAR WATER PLUMBING AND SUPPLY INC

LARRY GILL

APEX PACIFIC INC

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACKSON, DEMARCO & PECKENPAUGH

JACKSON DEMARCO TIDUS PETERSEN & PECKENPAUGH ALC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GILL AND BALDWIN LLP

LAW OFFICES OF RUSSELL R. ARENS

ABT & SIEGEL

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

BONETATI KINCAID & KINCAID, INC

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON AND TREGLIA

CALLAHAN, MCCUNE & WILLIS

ABT & SIEGEL

ARCHER NORRIS APC

Other Attorneys

MORROW & WHITE

LINCOLN, GUSTAFSON & CERCOS

LYNBERG & WATKINS

RALPH T EVANS

ERVIN COHEN & JESSUP LLP

RYAN MERCALDO & WORTHINGTON LLP

JIBIT CEPKINIAN, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/26/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/26/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/26/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/26/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDER & ORDER DISMISSING CASE) FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 03/21/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDER & ORDER DISMISSING CASE) FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 03/21/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PCH SHEET METAL & AIR CONDITIONING, INC ON 03/17/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PCH SHEET METAL & AIR CONDITIONING, INC ON 03/17/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY AITAL CUSTOM GLASS & MIRROR, INC ON 03/17/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY AITAL CUSTOM GLASS & MIRROR, INC ON 03/17/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/17/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/17/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/05/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/05/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY AITAL CUSTOM GLASS & MIRROR, INC REJECTED ON 03/05/2008.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY AITAL CUSTOM GLASS & MIRROR, INC REJECTED ON 03/05/2008.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PCH SHEET METAL & AIR CONDITIONING, INC REJECTED ON 03/05/2008.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PCH SHEET METAL & AIR CONDITIONING, INC REJECTED ON 03/05/2008.

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DATED 3/6/2008

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DATED 3/6/2008

ORDER DATED 3/6/2008

ORDER DATED 3/6/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 03/06/2008 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 03/06/2008 08:45:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 02/28/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 02/28/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH REJECTED ON 01/30/2008.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH REJECTED ON 01/30/2008.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 01/07/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 01/07/2008 09:00:00 AM.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/26/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/26/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF MINUTE ORDER & ORDER DISMISSING CASE) FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 03/21/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PCH SHEET METAL & AIR CONDITIONING, INC ON 03/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY AITAL CUSTOM GLASS & MIRROR, INC ON 03/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY JACK TRACY CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY AITAL CUSTOM GLASS & MIRROR, INC REJECTED ON 03/05/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY PCH SHEET METAL & AIR CONDITIONING, INC REJECTED ON 03/05/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DATED 3/6/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
201 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 07/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY TRABUCO PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX PACIFIC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ranger Insurance is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN BEAR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Claremont Liability Insurance Company is a litigant