This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/29/2017 at 08:50:58 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS HUBER

Case Summary

On 04/17/2009 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against HUBER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Claimant

MAXIMILIAN ROBERT HUBER

Respondent

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ELLA S. CHATTERJEE

Respondent Attorney

TONY RACKAUCKAS

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE 1-5000 FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 04/17/2009

CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE 1-5000 FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 04/17/2009

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 04/17/2009

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 04/17/2009

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/14/2009

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/14/2009

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/18/2009

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/18/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10404463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10228337.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10404463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10228337.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/23/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/23/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (UNAVAILABILITY) FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/30/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (UNAVAILABILITY) FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/30/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 07/20/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 07/20/2009 09:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 07/28/2009

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 07/28/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING (RESCHEDULED) FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 07/28/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING (RESCHEDULED) FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 07/28/2009

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL HEARINGS) FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 08/05/2009

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL HEARINGS) FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 08/05/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 08/14/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 08/14/2009

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2009
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 08/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL HEARINGS) FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 08/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD RESCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (RESCHEDULED) FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 07/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 07/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 07/20/2009 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2009
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT RECEIVED FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/30/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/2009 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10404463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10228337.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 06/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 05/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/20/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 04/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OPPOSING FORFEITURE 1-5000 FILED BY HUBER, MAXIMILIAN ROBERT ON 04/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less