This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/12/2016 at 08:24:01 (UTC).

THE IRVINE V FARZAD

Case Summary

On 01/12/2005 THE IRVINE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FARZAD. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0124

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES I

IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC

Defendant

ESMAEIL FARZAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/03/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/03/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/03/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/03/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/11/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/11/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/12/14) RECEIVED ON 09/11/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/12/14) RECEIVED ON 09/11/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11657345 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11481428.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11657345 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11481428.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/18/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/18/2014

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4248747 RECEIVED ON 09/18/2014 01:58:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11657345 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11481428.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/12/14) RECEIVED ON 09/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2367496 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2014 04:05:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 09/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2365074 RECEIVED ON 09/03/2014 03:50:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 03/22/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION (WRIT RETURNED) WAS FILED ON 02/23/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 01/20/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2005
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY UD - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION-UNLAWFUL DETAINER) WAS FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 01/19/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 01/19/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED TO SUMMONS) WAS FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 01/19/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2005
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/13/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC ON 01/12/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/12/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant