Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/15/2016 at 04:10:22 (UTC).

SZEMENYEI V VILLAGE

Case Summary

On 03/15/2006 SZEMENYEI filed an Other lawsuit against VILLAGE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1155

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ESMAIEL JASSIM, TRUSTEE OF THE ESMAIEL

VILLAGE BUILDERS A PARTNERSHIP

MICHAEL DEAN LOGE

ROBERT THOMAS CAREY

VILLAGE BUILDERS A CALIFORNIA GENERAL

MIKE LOGE

ESMAIEL JASSIM

ROBERT THOMAS

VILLAGE BUILDERS A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ESMAIEL JASSIM

ESMAIEL JASSIM, TRUSTEE OF THE ESMAIEL AND SHAHIN JASSIM FAMILY TRUST DATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATRICK J HOOLIHAN LAW CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID EPSTEIN LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY JASSIM, ESMAIEL REJECTED ON 02/23/2010.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY JASSIM, ESMAIEL REJECTED ON 02/23/2010.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION REJECTED ON 02/03/2010.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION REJECTED ON 02/03/2010.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY ESMAIEL JASSIM, TRUSTEE OF THE ESMAIEL AND SHAHIN JASSIM FAMILY TRUST DATED 6/31/1997 REJECTED ON 02/01/2010.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY ESMAIEL JASSIM, TRUSTEE OF THE ESMAIEL AND SHAHIN JASSIM FAMILY TRUST DATED 6/31/1997 REJECTED ON 02/01/2010.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 27.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10288661 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10112536.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 27.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10288661 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10112536.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY JASSIM, ESMAIEL REJECTED ON 02/23/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION REJECTED ON 02/03/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY SUBMITTED BY ESMAIEL JASSIM, TRUSTEE OF THE ESMAIEL AND SHAHIN JASSIM FAMILY TRUST DATED 6/31/1997 REJECTED ON 02/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 27.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10288661 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10112536.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/25/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2006
  • ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 06/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/24/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ESMAIEL JASSIM ON 05/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT (CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ESMAIEL JASSIM ON 05/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ESMAIEL JASSIM ON 05/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2006
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY SZEMENYEI CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Village Builders 98 LP is a litigant