This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 02:07:12 (UTC).

STERLING VS GONZALES

Case Summary

On 10/17/2006 STERLING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GONZALES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4441

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SANDRA D GONZALES

RIGO MOISE NAVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DE LA FLOR & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN J. HORN

LEIGH E. CHARNESS, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/28/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/28/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3394234 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3394234 REJECTED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11827295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11651550.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11827295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11651550.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/5/2015) RECEIVED ON 07/30/2015.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/5/2015) RECEIVED ON 07/30/2015.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/14/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/14/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2386725 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2386725 REJECTED.

DECLARATION OF DEFAULT/NON-COMPLIANCE (FILED AND ENTERED 6/10/2015) RECEIVED ON 06/05/2015.

DECLARATION OF DEFAULT/NON-COMPLIANCE (FILED AND ENTERED 6/10/2015) RECEIVED ON 06/05/2015.

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/05/2015

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/05/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/25/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/25/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE), 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 47.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11245849 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11069741.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE), 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 47.50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11245849 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11069741.

ORDER GRANTING (PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS) FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/17/2012

ORDER GRANTING (PAYMENT OF JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS) FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/17/2012

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR PERMISSION TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS; REINSTATEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S DRIVING PRIVILEGES) FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/17/2012

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR PERMISSION TO PAY JUDGMENT IN INSTALLMENTS; REINSTATEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S DRIVING PRIVILEGES) FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/17/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11217047 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11040939.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141- CERTIFYING A COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11217047 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11040939.

AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/20/2012

AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/20/2012

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/26/2012

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/26/2012

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY SUBMITTED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY REJECTED ON 06/21/2012.

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY SUBMITTED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY REJECTED ON 06/21/2012.

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY SUBMITTED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY REJECTED ON 06/14/2012.

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY SUBMITTED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY REJECTED ON 06/14/2012.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4540105 RECEIVED ON 04/28/2016 06:47:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3394234 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11827295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11651550.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 8/5/2015) RECEIVED ON 07/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3314560 RECEIVED ON 07/30/2015 10:47:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1269019 RECEIVED ON 07/14/2015 01:17:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2386725 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY DE LA FLOR & ASSOCIATES ON 07/20/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 05/29/2007 AT 13:30:00 IN HNB AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 05/29/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/11/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 04/10/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY STERLING CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/17/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sterling Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant