This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/15/2016 at 03:30:58 (UTC).

SOUTHERN VS COM SERVICES

Case Summary

On 03/13/2006 SOUTHERN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COM SERVICES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1046

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO

Defendants

WASHINGTON INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AN ARIZONA CORPO

COM SERVICES, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RAYMOND R MALLORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALSH & WALSH PC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 10/03/2012

JUDGMENT FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 10/03/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 09/26/2012 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 09/26/2012 01:30:00 PM.

JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/25/2012.

JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/25/2012.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (INTEREST & ATTORNEY'S FEES) FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (INTEREST & ATTORNEY'S FEES) FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 06/13/2012 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 06/13/2012 01:30:00 PM.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2012 AT 01:30:00 PM IN LH04 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2012 AT 01:30:00 PM IN LH04 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO IN THE AMOUNT OF 6785.34 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 413.90 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 607.12 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST COM SERVICES, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION;MALLORY, RAYMOND R ;WASHINGTON INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AN ARIZONA CORPO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 10/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED 09/26/2012 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED CONTINUED TO 01/09/2013 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/2013 AT 01:30:00 PM IN LH04 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/25/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (INTEREST & ATTORNEY'S FEES) FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 10/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 09/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 09/08/2006 AT 13:30:00 IN HNB AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 09/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 08/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 07/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 03/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY SOUTHERN ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATIO ON 03/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.