Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/14/2016 at 05:19:28 (UTC).

SIDNEY CARP VS. SILVIO SZTAIN

Case Summary

On 03/12/2008 SIDNEY CARP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SILVIO SZTAIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RITA CARP

SIDNEY CARP

E. A. MARKOVICH

PASS ENTERPRISES, INC.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ROOMS, INC.

SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

TUPY CONSTRUCTION

TILE & MARBLE DESIGN CO.

SILVIO SZTAIN

JASON HENRY

JELD-WEN, INC.

TCS CONSULTING, INC.

PEGASUS INTERIORS, INC.

P.S.I. THE PIPE SURGEON, INC.

TRI-TEK BURGLAR ALARM CO

AMBURGEY & SONS CONCRETE

FARINO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.

FRED AMBURGEY

CLK INSTALLATIIONS, INC.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MIKE PANNO

SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

SILVIO SZTAIN

JELD-WEN, INC.

TCS CONSULTING, INC.

FARINO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC.

TILE & MARBLE DESIGN CO.

TRI-TEK BURGLAR ALARM CO

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LARRY KENT

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

DOUGLAS B VANDERPOOL LAW OFFICE

MCATEE HARMEYER LLP

CHAUMONT LAW INC.

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LLP

AUSTIN BROWNWOOD & CANNON

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LARRY KENT

HOWARD STRICKROTH & PARKER LLP

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

DOUGLAS B VANDERPOOL LAW OFFICE

AUSTIN BROWNWOOD & CANNON

MCATEE HARMEYER LLP

BERGKVIST BERGKVIST & CARTER LLP

CHAUMONT LAW INC.

DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND LLP

LAW OFFICES OF PETER C FREEMAN

Other Attorneys

WELLMAN & WARREN LLP

VAIL,MACRAE & EDRINGTON

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (BY RIGHT OF ASSIGNMENT) FILED BY CARP, RITA; CARP, SIDNEY ON 03/15/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (BY RIGHT OF ASSIGNMENT) FILED BY CARP, RITA; CARP, SIDNEY ON 03/15/2010

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY TILE & MARBLE DESIGN CO. ON 03/10/2010

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY TILE & MARBLE DESIGN CO. ON 03/10/2010

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY TILE & MARBLE DESIGN CO. ON 03/01/2010

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY TILE & MARBLE DESIGN CO. ON 03/01/2010

OPPOSITION (TO RENEWED MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ROOMS, INC. ON 02/23/2010

OPPOSITION (TO RENEWED MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ROOMS, INC. ON 02/23/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 2010-01-25 10:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 2010-01-25 10:30:00.0.

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY JELD-WEN, INC. ON 12/14/2009

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY JELD-WEN, INC. ON 12/14/2009

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 11/09/2009

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 11/09/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 12/01/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 12/01/2009

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 10/28/2009

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 10/28/2009

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SZTAIN, SILVIO; SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 10/09/2009

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SZTAIN, SILVIO; SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 10/09/2009

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 10/09/2009

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 10/09/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10419316 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10243190.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10419316 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10243190.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/16/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/16/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY CARP, RITA; CARP, SIDNEY ON 06/02/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY CARP, RITA; CARP, SIDNEY ON 06/02/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 2009-05-28 14:43:16.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 2009-05-28 14:43:16.0.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 05/20/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 05/20/2009

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SZTAIN, SILVIO ON 03/23/2009

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SZTAIN, SILVIO ON 03/23/2009

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC.; SZTAIN, SILVIO ON 02/04/2009

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC.; SZTAIN, SILVIO ON 02/04/2009

176 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2010
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 2010-06-14 08:30:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 05/10/2010 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR - SET FOR MAY 10, 2010) FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ROOMS, INC. ON 05/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CARP, RITA; CARP, SIDNEY ON 03/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 03/16/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SZTAIN, SILVIO; SZTAIN-NIETO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CARP, SIDNEY; CARP, RITA ON 06/30/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 05/22/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CARP, RITA ON 05/22/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/29/2008 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10072141 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 96526.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CARP, SIDNEY; CARP, RITA ON 03/12/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CARP, SIDNEY; CARP, RITA ON 03/12/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CARP, SIDNEY; CARP, RITA ON 03/12/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARINO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JELD-WEN INC. is a litigant