This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/17/2016 at 11:01:54 (UTC).

SHEPARD VS A P INVESTMENTS INC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2006 SHEPARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A P INVESTMENTS INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6795

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDWARD J SHEPARD

CAROLINE A SHEPARD

ROY A SHEPARD

KATHLEEN A HARMON

Defendants

MILESTONE HOSPICE CARE, INC

TONY RICCI

MILESTONE HOSPICE, INC

CALIFORNIA CARE GROUP, LLC

NEWPORT RECO, INC

SENIOR LIVING SOLUTIONS, INC

MAHESH T PATEL

BAUTAM, INC

Cross Defendants

NEWPORT RECO INC

HARRY L MCNAMARA

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN P. KANE & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD GIBSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2007
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SHEPARD, CAROLINE A ON 12/19/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 230203 TO KEVIN P KANE & ASSOC ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00 DUE TO COURT ORDER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2007
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO KIRK NAKAMURA EFFECTIVE 01/02/2008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2007
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2007
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketORDER AFTER HEARING GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketORDER AFTER HEARING GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketORDER AFTER HEARING GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • DocketORDER AFTER HEARING GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2007
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2006
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY CAROLINE A SHEPARD ON 08/02/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE (CERTIFICATE OF DUE DILIGENCE) WAS FILED BY CAROLINE A SHEPARD ON 08/02/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY CAROLINE A SHEPARD ON 08/02/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY CAROLINE A SHEPARD ON 08/02/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY CAROLINE A SHEPARD ON 08/02/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY CAROLINE A SHEPARD ON 08/02/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 07/19/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2006
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY CAROLINE A SHEPARD ON 06/06/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2006
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY CAROLINE A SHEPARD ON 06/06/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2006
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 06/06/2006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less