Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/03/2016 at 05:34:06 (UTC).

SHEA V HENDRICKSON

Case Summary

On 12/15/2006 SHEA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HENDRICKSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5755

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, IN

SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC

Defendant

ARIN HENDRICKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GARY J GOUGH

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 12/01/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 12/01/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 04/15/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 04/15/2014

WRIT (UPDATED 02/19/14) RECEIVED ON 01/17/2014.

WRIT (UPDATED 02/19/14) RECEIVED ON 01/17/2014.

AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 01/16/2014

AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 01/16/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11527701 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11351508.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11527701 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11351508.

AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/15/2014.

AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/15/2014.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 01/15/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 01/15/2014

WRIT RECEIVED ON 01/15/2014.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 01/15/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11479731 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11303643.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11479731 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11303643.

WRIT (ISSUED 10/16/2013) RECEIVED ON 10/15/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED 10/16/2013) RECEIVED ON 10/15/2013.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1117282 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1117282 REJECTED.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 10/02/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 10/02/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 12/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 04/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (UPDATED 02/19/14) RECEIVED ON 01/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • WRIT TO SANTA CLARA COUNTY (ISSUED 01/17/14) RECEIVED 01/15/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 01/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11527701 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11351508.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 01/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RECEIVED ON 01/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4131418 RECEIVED ON 01/15/2014 11:42:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2007
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY UD - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 01/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 01/03/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 12/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 12/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 12/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2006
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (NOTICE OF UD TRIAL/DISMISSAL HEARING) WAS FILED ON 12/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 12/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC ON 12/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC. is a litigant