This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/27/2017 at 11:17:49 (UTC).

SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY VS. JLS CONCRETE PUMPING, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2009 SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JLS CONCRETE PUMPING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

JUAN GUILLEN

SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY

MANNING & MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

Defendant

JLS CONCRETE PUMPING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

MANNING & MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ L

LAW OFFICES OF CORSINO & SUTHERLAND

FISHER LAW, LTD

Defendant Attorneys

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1139456 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1139456 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 01/06/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 01/06/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 11/18/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 11/18/2013 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/17/2013

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/17/2013

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/27/2013 11:18:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/27/2013 11:18:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 08/22/2013

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 08/22/2013

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 07/29/2009

COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 07/29/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/01/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/01/2013 09:00:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/01/2013

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/01/2013

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 01/30/2013

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 01/30/2013

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING, INC. ON 12/04/2012

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING, INC. ON 12/04/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/26/2012 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/26/2012 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/13/2012 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/13/2012 09:00:00 AM.

STATEMENT - OTHER (REPORT) FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 07/30/2012

STATEMENT - OTHER (REPORT) FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 07/30/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 05/07/2012 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 05/07/2012 09:00:00 AM.

STATEMENT - OTHER (REPORT TO COURT ON BANKRUPTCY CASE STATUS) FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 05/03/2012

STATEMENT - OTHER (REPORT TO COURT ON BANKRUPTCY CASE STATUS) FILED BY GUILLEN, JUAN ON 05/03/2012

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1139456 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 01/06/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 11/18/2013 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 350.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10374528 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10198402.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JLS CONCRETE PUMPING, INC. ON 05/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B 05/05/2009 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/21/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 05/05/2009 AT 11:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 350.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10302184 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10126059.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILKINSON, RANDELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/04/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/04/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/04/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JLS Concrete Pumping Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SEABRIGHT INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP is a litigant