This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 06:02:51 (UTC).

RUTH MCCLAMMA STUEVE VS. RAYMOND NOVELL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2010 RUTH MCCLAMMA STUEVE filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against RAYMOND NOVELL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Appellants

DELANO FARMS, GP

MICHAEL MEYER

THE WINONA LEA STUEVE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001

THE EDGAR ERWIN STUEVE AND VERA MARIE STUEVE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001

DONNA CHERYL CLARKE STUEVE AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEDENT HAROLD J.J STUEVE

LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION

SBF NOTES, LP

THE 2001 EHS CHARITABLE REMANDER UNITRUST, DATED JULY 19, 2001

THE 2001 JCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001

THE 2001 EDGAR AND BEA STUEVE CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST, DATED JULY 19, 2001

THE DAVID JOHN STUEVE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001

LYNN HEINZ AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEDENT RUTH MARGARET STUEVE

DELANO FARMS, LP

THE DONNA CHERYL CLARKE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001

DAVID STUEVE AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEDENT HAROLD JJ. STUEVE

NOVELL & ASSOCIATES

GOOD STEWARDSHIP FOUNDATION

FIRMA FUNDING, LLC

LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND A. NOVELL

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MICHAEL MEYER

Interested Parties and Appellants

ATTORNEYS' INSURANCE MUTUAL RISK RETENTION GROUP

LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION

277 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

KEOBOPHA KEOPONG

DAILY LAW GROUP

SINCLITICO & BURNS

LAW OFFICE OF JAMES A. ANTON

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

DAILY LAW GROUP

Interested Party Attorney

HILL FARRER & BURRILL LLP

Other Attorneys

CHRISTINA L. PUTRELO

GREENBERG GROSS LLP

ROBIE & MATTHAI

THE LAW OFFICE OF DAVID J. SALVIN

BARNES LAW LLP

VREVICH & ASSOCIATES

EDGERTON & WEAVER LLP

SULLIVAN AND SULLIVAN LAW CORP

BIENERT, MILLER & KATZMAN, PLC

GIPSON HOFFMAN & PANCIONE

FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY, LLP

ARTHUR H BARENS-LAW OFFICES

KRONGOLD LAW CORP., P.C.

WEISBERG WILLNER & SLOANE, ALC

Miller Law

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY STUEVE CLAVERIE, JUDY CHRISTINE; BUCHALTER NEMER, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION ON 08/28/2018

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY STUEVE CLAVERIE, JUDY CHRISTINE; BUCHALTER NEMER, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION ON 08/28/2018

MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) FILED BY ALLEN, JAY WAYNE ON 03/02/2018

MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) FILED BY ALLEN, JAY WAYNE ON 03/02/2018

RESPONSE (TO PLAINTIFFS' MOOT AND UNTIMELY OBJECTION) FILED BY ALLEN, J. WAYNE ON 09/14/2015

RESPONSE (TO PLAINTIFFS' MOOT AND UNTIMELY OBJECTION) FILED BY ALLEN, J. WAYNE ON 09/14/2015

MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND A. NOVELL; NOVELL & ASSOCIATES; NOVELL, RAYMOND; MOUAT, HELEN; NOVELL, MAGGIE; MILLER, JENNIFER NOVELL; NOVELL, RAYMOND A. ON 08/28/2015

MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND A. NOVELL; NOVELL & ASSOCIATES; NOVELL, RAYMOND; MOUAT, HELEN; NOVELL, MAGGIE; MILLER, JENNIFER NOVELL; NOVELL, RAYMOND A. ON 08/28/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY MICHAEL L. MEYER AS TRUSTEE AND ON BEHALF OF THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE #2 CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST; THE 2001 JAA CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JACQUELINE ANN ARTHUR IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 JLB CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JEAN LA VERNE BEHREND IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 JCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JUDY CHRISTINE CLAVERIE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 DCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001;OTHERS ON 08/28/2015

OPPOSITION FILED BY MICHAEL L. MEYER AS TRUSTEE AND ON BEHALF OF THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE #2 CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST; THE 2001 JAA CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JACQUELINE ANN ARTHUR IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 JLB CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JEAN LA VERNE BEHREND IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 JCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JUDY CHRISTINE CLAVERIE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 DCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001;OTHERS ON 08/28/2015

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY ALLEN, J. WAYNE ON 05/01/2015

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY ALLEN, J. WAYNE ON 05/01/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/24/2015

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/24/2015

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL L. MEYER AS TRUSTEE AND ON BEHALF OF THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE #2 CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST; THE 2001 JAA CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JACQUELINE ANN ARTHUR IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 JLB CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JEAN LA VERNE BEHREND IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 JCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JUDY CHRISTINE CLAVERIE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 DCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001;OTHERS ON 04/24/2015

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY MICHAEL L. MEYER AS TRUSTEE AND ON BEHALF OF THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE #2 CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE 2001 HAROLD AND RUTH STUEVE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST; THE 2001 JAA CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JACQUELINE ANN ARTHUR IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 JLB CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JEAN LA VERNE BEHREND IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 JCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001; THE JUDY CHRISTINE CLAVERIE IRREVOCABLE LIFE INSURANCE TRUST DATED MAY 8, 2001; THE 2001 DCC CHARITABLE REMAINDER UNITRUST DATED JULY 19, 2001;OTHERS ON 04/24/2015

OBJECTION (TO THE AMENDED SECOND RECOMMENDATION OF THE DISCOVERY REFEREE) FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA ON 10/23/2014

OBJECTION (TO THE AMENDED SECOND RECOMMENDATION OF THE DISCOVERY REFEREE) FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA ON 10/23/2014

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/24/2014

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/24/2014

PROPOSED ORDER (ON EX PARTE APPLICATION) RECEIVED ON 01/07/2014.

PROPOSED ORDER (ON EX PARTE APPLICATION) RECEIVED ON 01/07/2014.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA; ARTHUR, JACQUELINE ANN; BEHREND, JEAN; STUEVE, LLOYD L.; STUEVE, DAVID; STUEVE, CLESON; STUEVE, LEA; CLARKE, DONNA CHERYL; CLAVERIE, JUDY CHRISTINE; STUEVE, KIM;OTHERS ON 07/12/2013

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA; ARTHUR, JACQUELINE ANN; BEHREND, JEAN; STUEVE, LLOYD L.; STUEVE, DAVID; STUEVE, CLESON; STUEVE, LEA; CLARKE, DONNA CHERYL; CLAVERIE, JUDY CHRISTINE; STUEVE, KIM;OTHERS ON 07/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 92.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11379030 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11202922.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 92.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11379030 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11202922.

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA ON 10/22/2012

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA ON 10/22/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11064291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10888183.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11064291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10888183.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BERGER KAHN, A LAW CORPORATION ON 12/20/2011

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BERGER KAHN, A LAW CORPORATION ON 12/20/2011

OPPOSITION FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA; ARTHUR, JACQUELINE ANN; BEHREND, JEAN; STUEVE, LLOYD L.; STUEVE, DAVID; STUEVE, CLESON; STUEVE, LEA; CLARKE, DONNA CHERYL; CLAVERIE, JUDY CHRISTINE; STUEVE, KIM;OTHERS ON 11/08/2011

OPPOSITION FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA; ARTHUR, JACQUELINE ANN; BEHREND, JEAN; STUEVE, LLOYD L.; STUEVE, DAVID; STUEVE, CLESON; STUEVE, LEA; CLARKE, DONNA CHERYL; CLAVERIE, JUDY CHRISTINE; STUEVE, KIM;OTHERS ON 11/08/2011

MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA (NON PARTY SUBPOENA) FILED BY ATTORNEYS' INSURANCE MUTUAL RISK RETENTION GROUP ON 10/03/2011

MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA (NON PARTY SUBPOENA) FILED BY ATTORNEYS' INSURANCE MUTUAL RISK RETENTION GROUP ON 10/03/2011

2,422 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER G057080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY BUCHALTER, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2775346 RECEIVED ON 03/20/2019 05:14:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G057080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT (AMENDED) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2766913 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2019 02:52:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ROBERT BARNES SOLE PROP DBA BARNES LAW FOR 24 - TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL IN THE AMOUNT OF 5,203.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12501954 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12325653.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4,041 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2010
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2011 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2011 AT 02:00:00 PM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA; ARTHUR, JACQUELINE ANN; BEHREND, JEAN; STUEVE, LLOYD L.; STUEVE, DAVID; STUEVE, CLESON; STUEVE, LEA; CLARKE, DONNA CHERYL; CLAVERIE, JUDY CHRISTINE; STUEVE, KIM;OTHERS ON 09/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA; ARTHUR, JACQUELINE ANN; BEHREND, JEAN; STUEVE, LLOYD L.; STUEVE, DAVID; STUEVE, CLESON; STUEVE, LEA; CLARKE, DONNA CHERYL; CLAVERIE, JUDY CHRISTINE; STUEVE, KIM;OTHERS ON 09/28/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 212055 RECEIVED ON 09/28/2010 11:59:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 17.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10736692 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10560584.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 905.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10736320 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10560212.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 09/24/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA ON 09/24/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY STUEVE, RUTH MCCLAMMA ON 09/24/2010

    Read MoreRead Less