This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/06/2017 at 08:47:26 (UTC).

ROBERT ANDERSON VS. LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2009 ROBERT ANDERSON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GENE LEE

TIFFANY MEHRMANN

DENNIS WEINBERG

KRISTEN SEGAL

WAIL POON

LORI DARWISH

JOHN MEHRMANN

VERNA KANAMORI

PATRICIA SALAS

CHRISTOPHER CARCERANO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PADILLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

RALPH PADILLA JR

HECTOR CEDILLO

NEW PLUMBING CONTRACTORS INC

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant

NEW PLUMBING CONTRACTORS INC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

WEST COAST DRYWALL, INC.

PETERSON BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION

PADILLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

RALPH PADILLA JR

NEW PLUMBING CONTRACTORS INC

VALENTE CONCRETE, INC.

WESTERN SPECIALTIES

MISSION SHEET METAL INC

OAK LEAF LANDSCAPE, INC.

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFER LAW GROUP

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

HORTON, OBERRECHT, KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & FRASER

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

BRADY VORWERCK RYDER & CASPINO

Other Attorneys

SKAPIK LAW GROUP

GRAY - DUFFY, LLP

GREEN & HALL

THE LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEN

LIEDLE, LOUNSBERY, LARSON & LIDL, LLP

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M BUREK

HARMEYER LAW GROUP, APC

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

AUSTIN BROWNWOOD & CANNON

BRAGG & KULUVA

LIEBMAN QUIGLEY SHEPPARD & SOULEMA

LAW OFFICES OF MARC JENNINGS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CORBIN CUSTOM TILE INC ON 06/05/2012

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CORBIN CUSTOM TILE INC ON 06/05/2012

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 09/28/2011 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 09/28/2011 10:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF CHERYL A. KIRKPATRICK RE: OSC) FILED BY PADILLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ON 09/16/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF CHERYL A. KIRKPATRICK RE: OSC) FILED BY PADILLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ON 09/16/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 08/25/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 08/25/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT ON 08/25/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE) FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT ON 08/25/2011

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 08/24/2011

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 08/24/2011

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/24/2011 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/24/2011 10:00:00 AM.

STATEMENT - OTHER (OSC) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 08/17/2011

STATEMENT - OTHER (OSC) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 08/17/2011

NOTICE OF RULING (& FURTHER OSC RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 07/20/2011

NOTICE OF RULING (& FURTHER OSC RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 07/20/2011

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/20/2011 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/20/2011 10:00:00 AM.

STATEMENT - OTHER (OSC) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 07/18/2011

STATEMENT - OTHER (OSC) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 07/18/2011

STATEMENT - OTHER (OSC RE: DISMISSAL) FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT; ANDERSON, ROBYNN; GAM, GILBERT; GAM, AERAN; GARCIA, DONALD; LEE, GENE; LEE, KUM; MEHRMANN, JOHN; MEHRMANN, TIFFANY; MILLER, KURT;OTHERS ON 07/13/2011

STATEMENT - OTHER (OSC RE: DISMISSAL) FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT; ANDERSON, ROBYNN; GAM, GILBERT; GAM, AERAN; GARCIA, DONALD; LEE, GENE; LEE, KUM; MEHRMANN, JOHN; MEHRMANN, TIFFANY; MILLER, KURT;OTHERS ON 07/13/2011

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 06/29/2011

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 06/29/2011

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 06/20/2011

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 06/20/2011

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/15/2011 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/15/2011 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 06/15/2011

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 06/15/2011

STATEMENT - OTHER (RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL) FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT; ANDERSON, ROBYNN; GAM, GILBERT; GAM, AERAN; GARCIA, DONALD; LEE, GENE; LEE, KUM; MEHRMANN, JOHN; MEHRMANN, TIFFANY; MILLER, KURT;OTHERS ON 06/08/2011

STATEMENT - OTHER (RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL) FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT; ANDERSON, ROBYNN; GAM, GILBERT; GAM, AERAN; GARCIA, DONALD; LEE, GENE; LEE, KUM; MEHRMANN, JOHN; MEHRMANN, TIFFANY; MILLER, KURT;OTHERS ON 06/08/2011

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARING) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 06/02/2011

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL HEARING) FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; LENNAR SALES CORP. ON 06/02/2011

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CORBIN CUSTOM TILE INC ON 06/05/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2115351 RECEIVED ON 06/05/2012 04:42:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 09/28/2011 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (OF CHERYL A. KIRKPATRICK RE: OSC) FILED BY PADILLA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ON 09/16/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 259944 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2011 10:45:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2011
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
288 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT ((FIRST)) FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT; ANDERSON, ROBYNN; GAM, AERAN; GAM, GILBERT; GARCIA, DONALD; LEE, GENE; LEE, KUM; MEHRMANN, JOHN; MEHRMANN, TIFFANY; MILLER, JEANETTE;OTHERS ON 12/10/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2009-11-17 08:15:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2010 AT 10:30 AMIN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2010 AT 10:30:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 905.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10496795 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10320668.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 10/22/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT; ANDERSON, ROBYNN; GAM, GILBERT; GAM, AERAN; GARCIA, DONALD; LEE, GENE; LEE, KUM; MEHRMANN, JOHN; MEHRMANN, TIFFANY; MILLER, KURT; MILLER, JEANETTE; MILLER, LYNETTE; NGUYEN, THU; RUSHING, KEVIN; SPITLER, DAMON; SPITLER, PATRICIA; STILWAGNER, MIKE; STILWAGNER, LISA ON 10/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT; ANDERSON, ROBYNN; GAM, GILBERT; GAM, AERAN; GARCIA, DONALD; LEE, GENE; LEE, KUM; MEHRMANN, JOHN; MEHRMANN, TIFFANY; MILLER, KURT; MILLER, JEANETTE; MILLER, LYNETTE; NGUYEN, THU; RUSHING, KEVIN; SPITLER, DAMON; SPITLER, PATRICIA; STILWAGNER, MIKE; STILWAGNER, LISA ON 10/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ANDERSON, ROBERT; ANDERSON, ROBYNN; GAM, GILBERT; GAM, AERAN; GARCIA, DONALD; LEE, GENE; LEE, KUM; MEHRMANN, JOHN; MEHRMANN, TIFFANY; MILLER, KURT; MILLER, JEANETTE; MILLER, LYNETTE; NGUYEN, THU; RUSHING, KEVIN; SPITLER, DAMON; SPITLER, PATRICIA; STILWAGNER, MIKE; STILWAGNER, LISA ON 10/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN SPECIALTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where VALENTE CONCRETE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW PLUMBING CONTRACTORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST COAST DRYWALL, INC. is a litigant