This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/18/2016 at 03:34:27 (UTC).

RESURGENCE VS BEHJAT

Case Summary

On 06/22/2006 RESURGENCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BEHJAT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3426

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

JURDI A BEHJAT

Assignee

FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTM

RESURGENCE LEGAL GROUP, P.C.

Assignee Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12030667 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11854667.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12030667 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11854667.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/16/16) RECEIVED ON 09/15/2016.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/16/16) RECEIVED ON 09/15/2016.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 09/15/2016

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 09/15/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 09/15/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 09/15/2016

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 11/10/2015

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 11/10/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 11/02/2010

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 11/02/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 06/25/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 06/25/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 03/20/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 03/20/2008

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12030667 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11854667.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 9/16/16) RECEIVED ON 09/15/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 09/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 09/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4606615 RECEIVED ON 09/15/2016 03:32:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP ON 11/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4462482 RECEIVED ON 11/10/2015 11:51:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2012
  • TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 11/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 06/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 10/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE - SUBSTITUTED) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 07/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 06/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC ON 06/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 06/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less