This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/15/2016 at 02:26:56 (UTC).

RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC VS. CAMERON

Case Summary

On 03/09/2006 RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAMERON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0981

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC

RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT

Defendant

JAMES P CAMERON

Assignee

COLLECT ACCESS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTM

RESURGENCE LEGAL GROUP, P.C.

Assignee Attorney

ZEE LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 04/28/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 04/28/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11808253 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11632564.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11808253 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11632564.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/30/15) RECEIVED ON 06/29/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/30/15) RECEIVED ON 06/29/2015.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 06/18/2015 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 06/18/2015 09:30:00 AM.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT ON 06/08/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT ON 06/08/2010

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT ON 09/11/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT ON 09/11/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 01/21/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 01/21/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT ON 08/21/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT ON 08/21/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT ON 06/25/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC LEGAL DEPARTMENT ON 06/25/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10118602 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 142968.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10118602 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 142968.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 04/25/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 04/25/2008

DECLARATION OF LOST WRIT FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 04/25/2008

DECLARATION OF LOST WRIT FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 04/25/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10060611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 84998.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10060611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 84998.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 04/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1319372 RECEIVED ON 04/28/2016 01:22:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11808253 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11632564.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/30/15) RECEIVED ON 06/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY COLLECT ACCESS LLC ON 06/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4399039 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2015 03:27:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 06/18/2015 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY RESURGENCE FINANCIAL, LLC ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/09/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.