Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/03/2017 at 04:33:26 (UTC).

REBECCA MCMANAWAY VS. JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST

Case Summary

On 05/21/2009 REBECCA MCMANAWAY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

REBECCA MCMANAWAY

ADRIAN MCMANAWAY

JESSICA NICKELL

DAVID MCMANAWAY

JOHN BIVENS JR

ALISHA BIVENS

JOHN BIVENS

JEANNETTE NICKELL

ADRIANNA BIVENS

CARA ERICKSON

THE DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING

Defendants

JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST

JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST

JOHN DARCY, AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST

SANDRA HIGGINS

LETICIA SANCHEZ AS OWNER AND MANAGING AGENT

SANDRA HIGGINS AS OWNER AND MANAGING AGENT

LETICIA SANCHEZ

JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER

JOHN DARCY BOLTON

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS P. DELL

LAW OFFICE OF SEAN G. ERENSTOFT

RALPH M TSONG

TIMOTHY M MUSCAT

VINODHINI RAMAGOPAL

Defendant Attorneys

MACRAE & EDRINGTON

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

LAW OFFICES OF CUMMINGS MYER

BREMER & WHYTE

Other Attorneys

BRANCART & BRANCART

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 10/26/2011 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 10/26/2011 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA ON 07/22/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA ON 07/22/2011

ORDER - OTHER (DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION) FILED BY JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER; BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 06/10/2011

ORDER - OTHER (DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION) FILED BY JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER; BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 06/10/2011

CASE REASSIGNED TO GAIL ANDLER EFFECTIVE 07/01/2011.

CASE REASSIGNED TO GAIL ANDLER EFFECTIVE 07/01/2011.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION) FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA ON 05/13/2011

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION) FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA ON 05/13/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF THOMAS B. CUMMINGS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CERTIFY) FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 05/06/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF THOMAS B. CUMMINGS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CERTIFY) FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 05/06/2011

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER; SANDRA HIGGINS AS OWNER AND MANAGING AGENT; LETICIA SANCHEZ AS OWNER AND MANAGING AGENT; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY, AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 05/04/2011

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER; SANDRA HIGGINS AS OWNER AND MANAGING AGENT; LETICIA SANCHEZ AS OWNER AND MANAGING AGENT; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY, AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 05/04/2011

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION) FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA ON 04/13/2011

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION) FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA ON 04/13/2011

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER) FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; HIGGINS, SANDRA; BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; HIGGINS, SANDRA; BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; SANCHEZ, LETICIA; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER;OTHERS ON 03/16/2011

REPLY TO OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER) FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; HIGGINS, SANDRA; BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; HIGGINS, SANDRA; BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; SANCHEZ, LETICIA; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST, AS OWNER;OTHERS ON 03/16/2011

DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; HIGGINS, SANDRA; SANCHEZ, LETICIA; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 02/18/2011

DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; HIGGINS, SANDRA; SANCHEZ, LETICIA; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 02/18/2011

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; HIGGINS, SANDRA; SANCHEZ, LETICIA; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY, AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 12/03/2010

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY BOLTON, JOHN DARCY; HIGGINS, SANDRA; SANCHEZ, LETICIA; JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY BOLTON AS OWNER AND AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST; JOHN DARCY, AS TRUSTEE FOR JOHN DARCY BOLTON TRUST ON 12/03/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 985.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10782343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10606235.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 167 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 985.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10782343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10606235.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA;OTHERS ON 09/27/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA;OTHERS ON 09/27/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION) RECEIVED ON 06/15/2010.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION) RECEIVED ON 06/15/2010.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA ON 07/24/2009

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA ON 07/24/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE) FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA ON 07/15/2009

NOTICE OF HEARING (OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE) FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA ON 07/15/2009

CLASS ACTION / B 17200 QUESTIONNAIRE FILED BY MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN ON 05/28/2009

CLASS ACTION / B 17200 QUESTIONNAIRE FILED BY MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN ON 05/28/2009

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER VELASQUEZ, DAVID.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER VELASQUEZ, DAVID.

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 10/26/2011 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2011-09-14 09:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE CONTINUED TO 10/26/2011 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/2011 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX101 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 2011-08-19 10:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE 2011-08-19 10:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
176 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 550.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10396003 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10219877.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/03/2009 01:35:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/07/2009 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX101 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CLASS ACTION / B 17200 QUESTIONNAIRE FILED BY MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN ON 05/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 350.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10383642 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10207516.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER VELASQUEZ, DAVID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA ON 05/21/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MCMANAWAY, REBECCA; ERICKSON, CARA; MCMANAWAY, DAVID; MCMANAWAY, ADRIAN; NICKELL, JEANNETTE; NICKELL, JESSICA; BIVENS, JOHN; BIVENS, ALISHA; BIVENS, JOHN JR; BIVENS, ADRIANNA ON 05/21/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant