This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 07:17:44 (UTC).

PTAK VS STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT

Case Summary

On 11/06/2006 PTAK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1755

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHELLE MARIE PTAK

RICHARD A PTAK AND MICHELLE MARIE PTAK

RICHARD A PTAK

ELLEN DENISE HALL

DAVID GENE HALL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HARIM & PETE'S PAINTING

STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT

WINDSOR INDUSTRIES, A CALIFORNIA CORPO

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GOLDEN WEST PLUMBING, INC

HART BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC

STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT

SIMON CONSTRUCTION

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALISO AIR INC

KLOSTERMAN FLOOR SYSTEMS INC

ROYAL INDUSTRIES INC

JOHN H. WARNOCK

CMT SHEET METAL

GOLDEN WEST PLUMBING, INC

HART BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC

WB CONTRACTORS INC

STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT

LAND CARE INC

OJ INSULATION INC

SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC

SIMON CONSTRUCTION

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOMASSIAN THROCKMORTON & INOUYE LLP

BRADY, VORWERCK, RYDER & CASPINO

ROSEMAN & ASSOCIATES, APC

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ULICH & TERRY LLP

BORCHARD & CALLAHAN, APC

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

KRING & CHUNG LLP

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

SUSSON PARRETT & ODELL

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

Other Attorneys

TILLES WEBB KULLA & GRANT

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

HOSP GILBERT BERGSTEN & PHILLIPS

KOENIG JACOBSEN LLP

STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

MULLEN & BADAME LLP

POLLARD ARCHER CRANERT CRAWFORD & STEVENS

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

KLINEDINST PC

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2010-03-01 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2010-03-01 09:00:00.0.

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SOUTHLAND WINDOWS INC ON 12/10/2009

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SOUTHLAND WINDOWS INC ON 12/10/2009

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WESSELN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 11/09/2009

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WESSELN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC ON 11/09/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALISO AIR INC ON 11/06/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALISO AIR INC ON 11/06/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT; STONEFIELD COTO IV, LP ON 10/26/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT; STONEFIELD COTO IV, LP ON 10/26/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY GOLDEN WEST PLUMBING, INC ON 10/05/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY GOLDEN WEST PLUMBING, INC ON 10/05/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY THORNSTEEL & IRONWORKS, INC. ON 08/17/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY THORNSTEEL & IRONWORKS, INC. ON 08/17/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 18, 2009 STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY LAS PLUMAS LUMBER & TRUSS ON 05/13/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE ON MAY 18, 2009 STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY LAS PLUMAS LUMBER & TRUSS ON 05/13/2009

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION ON 05/08/2009

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION ON 05/08/2009

PAYMENT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10372577 IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00 VOIDED DUE TO DUPLICATE PAYMENT.

PAYMENT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10372577 IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00 VOIDED DUE TO DUPLICATE PAYMENT.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10331368 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10155242.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10331368 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10155242.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL & EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT OFF) FILED BY HART BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/16/2009

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL & EXTEND DISCOVERY CUT OFF) FILED BY HART BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC ON 03/16/2009

OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO SEVER STONEFIELD'S CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY CROWTHER PRENTISS CORP; C&R SYSTEMS, INC. ON 01/14/2009

OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO SEVER STONEFIELD'S CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY CROWTHER PRENTISS CORP; C&R SYSTEMS, INC. ON 01/14/2009

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT ON 11/21/2008

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT ON 11/21/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF EXECUTED RECOMENDATION AND ORDER) FILED BY STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT ON 10/30/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF EXECUTED RECOMENDATION AND ORDER) FILED BY STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT ON 10/30/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STONEFIELD COTO IV, LP ON 09/10/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY STONEFIELD COTO IV, LP ON 09/10/2008

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDEN WEST PLUMBING, INC ON 06/04/2008

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDEN WEST PLUMBING, INC ON 06/04/2008

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE ADDITIONAL GEOTECHNICAL TESTING BY PLAINTIFFS AND REVISION TO CMO) FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK AND MICHELLE MARIE PTAK TRUSTEES OF THE FIRST; PTAK, MICHELLE MARIE ON 02/13/2008

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE ADDITIONAL GEOTECHNICAL TESTING BY PLAINTIFFS AND REVISION TO CMO) FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK AND MICHELLE MARIE PTAK TRUSTEES OF THE FIRST; PTAK, MICHELLE MARIE ON 02/13/2008

281 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT; STONEFIELD COTO IV LP ON 04/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2010-04-12 09:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2010
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED ON 3-15-07) FILED BY STONEFIELD DEVELOPMENT; STONEFIELD COTO IV LP ON 04/09/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2010-03-01 09:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 2010-02-26 10:00:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/2010 AT 09:00 AMIN DEPARTMENT CX103.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/2010 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/26/2010 AT 10:00:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (REQUIRING PRINCIPALS AND INSURANCE CARRIERS' ADJUSTERS OR OTHER REPRESENTATIVES TO APPEAR AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/11/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
476 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 02/27/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2007
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY) WAS FILED BY MICHELLE MARIE PTAK ON 02/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2007
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY) WAS FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK ON 02/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK ON 01/26/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK ON 01/26/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2007
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK ON 01/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK ON 01/05/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK ON 11/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY RICHARD A PTAK ON 11/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.