This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 21:56:09 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE VS SPINOSA

Case Summary

On 04/02/2001 PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SPINOSA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1871

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

NICHOLE JANAI SPINOSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAY W. SMITH

 

Court Documents

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/24/2009

LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/24/2009

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/24/2009

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/24/2009

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11134888 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10958780.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11134888 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10958780.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/03/2012

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/03/2012

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/03/2012

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/03/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/13/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/13/2014

WRIT (ISSUED 06/19/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 06/19/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11612629 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11436615.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11612629 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11436615.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

WRIT (ORANGE) ISSUED ON 05/17/2021

WRIT (ORANGE) ISSUED ON 05/17/2021

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/13/2021

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/13/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12886042 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12713821.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12886042 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12713821.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12886042 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12713821.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ORANGE) ISSUED ON 05/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21006034 RECEIVED ON 04/13/2021 11:27:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11612629 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11436615.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3155725 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2014 08:58:29 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 06/19/2014) RECEIVED ON 06/13/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/13/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2012
  • DocketTRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/03/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11134888 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10958780.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 01/26/2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/24/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/24/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2002
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2002
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FOR PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY IN THE AMOUNT OF 18217.60 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST SPINOSA, NICHOLE JANAI .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE is a litigant