Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/14/2016 at 05:23:59 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS VS DE LA PENA

Case Summary

On 02/27/2006 PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DE LA PENA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0903

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS

Defendant

TERISITA DE LA PENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WU, SCOTT D: LAW OFFICES OF

LAW OFFICES OF CLARK GAREN

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/07/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/07/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11826206 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11650474.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11826206 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11650474.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/03/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/03/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/03/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/03/2015

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 01/03/2013

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 01/03/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 01/03/2013 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 01/03/2013 09:30:00 AM.

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT WITH SHERIFF'S MEMO) FILED BY DE LA PENA, TERISITA ON 12/28/2012

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT WITH SHERIFF'S MEMO) FILED BY DE LA PENA, TERISITA ON 12/28/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, OVERAGE TRUST > $10 IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11278293 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11102185.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, OVERAGE TRUST > $10 IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11278293 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11102185.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 12/07/2012

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 12/07/2012

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT) FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 12/07/2012

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT) FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 12/07/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11218407 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11042299.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11218407 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11042299.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 10/19/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 10/19/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 05/16/2011

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 05/16/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 05/16/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 05/16/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10822591 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10646483.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10822591 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10646483.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10507982.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10507982.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10486662 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10310536.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10486662 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10310536.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/18/2009

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/18/2009

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4418451 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2015 05:22:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11826206 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11650474.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 8/4/15) RECEIVED ON 08/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4415737 RECEIVED ON 08/03/2015 05:31:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 292918 TO PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00 DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 09/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE BY COUNSEL OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) WAS FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 09/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARD ON 09/11/2006 AT 13:30:00 IN HLH AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (CONTINUANCE - COURT ORDER) ON 09/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 09/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 08/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 07/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 02/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 02/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS ON 02/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL COLLECTION CONSULTANTS is a litigant