This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/13/2017 at 08:17:08 (UTC).

PHYGEN, LLC VS. PAUL RANDALL

Case Summary

On 10/13/2010 PHYGEN, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PAUL RANDALL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYGEN, LLC

Defendants

PAUL RANDALL

SUMMIT MEDICAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALMAGES & DAVIDSON

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 03/14/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 03/14/2011

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/08/2011 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/08/2011 08:45:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/28/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/28/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/28/2011

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/28/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/25/2011

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/25/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/11/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/11/2011

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY PHYGEN, LLC REJECTED ON 01/21/2011.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY PHYGEN, LLC REJECTED ON 01/21/2011.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 12/14/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 12/14/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 12/14/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 12/14/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2011 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2011 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10748432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10572324.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10748432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10572324.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/13/2010.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/13/2010.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

COMPLAINT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2011
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 03/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/08/2011 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2011 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2011 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/25/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY PHYGEN, LLC REJECTED ON 01/21/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 01/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY PHYGEN, LLC REJECTED ON 01/21/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 12/14/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 12/14/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2011 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 133- COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 355.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10748432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10572324.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/13/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PHYGEN, LLC ON 10/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMIT MEDICAL, INC. is a litigant