This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 04:53:34 (UTC).

PEDROZA VS THE ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L.P. BY TOLL BROTHERS

Case Summary

On 10/27/2006 PEDROZA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against THE ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0221

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLINTON GRIGGS JR

CAROL GRIGGS

JAMES BREMER

ROBERT PEDROZA SR

CARLENE PEDROZA

SYLVIA HADDADIN

FRANK BREWER

YVONNE BREWER

KAREN BREMER

Defendants

ALLIANCE MECHANICAL HEATING & AIR COND

YL ASSOCIATES IV, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SOUTH COAST PLUMBING SYSTEMS INC

DOORWAY MANUFACTURING

SILVERADO CONCRETE

DOORWAY MANUFACTURING CO

DAVIS BROTHERS

PREFERRED FRAMING, INC.

CS DRYWALL INC

TRIUMPH SHEET METAL INC

CS DRYWALL

70 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON & KRIGER

Defendant Attorney

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

THAGARD, REISS & BROWN LLP

THAGARD & REISS LLP

WAYNE THOMAS & ASSOCIATES

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

MURCHISON & CUMMING, LLP

Other Attorneys

KRING & CHUNG LLP

SPRINGEL & FINK, LLP

STEWART & EUM

GRAVES & KING LLP

KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

MILANI & ASSOCIATES INC

MCATEE HARMEYER LLP

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & OMEARA LLP

BRAGG & KULUVA

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

KRING AND CHUNG

KLINEDINST PC

LETOFSKY MCCLAIN

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CS DRYWALL INC ON 11/12/2008

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CS DRYWALL INC ON 11/12/2008

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY DAVIS BROTHERS ON 11/06/2008

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY DAVIS BROTHERS ON 11/06/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 10/28/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 10/28/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SOUTH COAST PLUMBING SYSTEMS INC ON 10/22/2008

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SOUTH COAST PLUMBING SYSTEMS INC ON 10/22/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 08/27/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 08/27/2008

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 877.6(A)(B) FILED BY PREFERRED FRAMING, INC. CROSS-DEFENDANT IN CASE 07CC01294 BREWER VS THE ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE, L.P. BY TOLL BROTHERS

APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 877.6(A)(B) FILED BY PREFERRED FRAMING, INC. CROSS-DEFENDANT IN CASE 07CC01294 BREWER VS THE ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE, L.P. BY TOLL BROTHERS

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BREWER, FRANK ON 05/19/2008

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BREWER, FRANK ON 05/19/2008

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS-THE ON 03/25/2008

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS-THE ON 03/25/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10064120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 88505.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10064120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 88505.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS-THE ON 02/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS-THE ON 02/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS-THE ON 02/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS-THE ON 02/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS-THE ON 02/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS-THE ON 02/14/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 07/09/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 07/09/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CANAC KITCHENS US LIMITED ON 04/21/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CANAC KITCHENS US LIMITED ON 04/21/2008

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PEDROZA SR, ROBERT ON 04/15/2008

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PEDROZA SR, ROBERT ON 04/15/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CANAC KITCHENS US LIMITED ON 03/25/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CANAC KITCHENS US LIMITED ON 03/25/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2008-01-09 10:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2008-01-09 10:30:00.0.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PEDROZA SR, ROBERT ON 01/03/2008

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PEDROZA SR, ROBERT ON 01/03/2008

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT & APPLICATION RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY DAVEY ROOFING INC ON 05/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY DAVEY ROOFING INC ON 05/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DAVEY ROOFING INC ON 05/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 04/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 04/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/27/2009 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • COURT ORDERED ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PEDROZA SR, ROBERT ON 04/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (COMPLAINT) FILED BY PEDROZA SR, ROBERT; PEDROZA, CARLENE; GRIGGS JR, CLINTON; GRIGGS, CAROL; HADDADIN, SYLVIA ON 04/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
344 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2007
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 01/10/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2007
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT (CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE L P BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 01/10/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2007
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY ESTATES AT SUMMIT CHASE LP BY TOLL BROTHERS ON 01/10/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE) WAS FILED BY ROBERT PEDROZA SR ON 12/04/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED ON 11/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 11/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 10/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ROBERT PEDROZA SR ON 10/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ROBERT PEDROZA SR ON 10/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.