Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 06:12:20 (UTC).

PEDRO VERONESE VS. KAMBIZ RAZAGHI

Case Summary

On 10/23/2008 PEDRO VERONESE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAMBIZ RAZAGHI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PAULO VERONESE

PEDRO VERONESE

LAW OFFICES OF TINA LOCKLEAR

CENTRAL ESCROW INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GOLDEN SHIELD INVESTMENTS, INC.

VERTEX EQUITIES, INC.

KAMBIZ RAZAGHI

KAVEH RAZAGHI

INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC

RIDGE MOUNTAIN, LLC

HIRAD EMADI

JOHN WHITE

HILLTOP PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, INC.

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN D. OTT, APC

Assignee

CONSOLIDATED EQUITIES

Not Classified By Court

SUZANNE V. CHAMBERLAIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John E. Bouzane and Associates

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF SAMAN BEHNAM

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN D. OTT, APC

BURKHALTER KESSLER CLEMENT & GEORGE LLP

Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF TINA LOCKLEAR

SNELL & WILMER LLP

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY G. FLORENCE

Other Attorneys

MAURICE K WONG

BURKHALTER KESSLER GOODMAN & GEORGE, L

BURKHALTER KESSLER CLEMENT & GEORGE LL

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC ON 06/21/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC ON 06/21/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (OF REVISED JUDGMENT) FILED BY CENTRAL ESCROW INC ON 05/07/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (OF REVISED JUDGMENT) FILED BY CENTRAL ESCROW INC ON 05/07/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY VERONESE, PAULO ON 05/01/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY VERONESE, PAULO ON 05/01/2013

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 02/01/2013

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 02/01/2013

MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 12/31/2012

MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 12/31/2012

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RETURN OF EXHIBITS AND RECEIPT FOR RECORDS

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR RETURN OF EXHIBITS AND RECEIPT FOR RECORDS

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL 03/02/2012 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL 03/02/2012 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 12/02/2011 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION - OTHER 12/02/2011 10:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JOSHUA A. WALDMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PATRE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY EMADI, HIRAD; WHITE, JOHN; INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC ON 10/19/2011

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JOSHUA A. WALDMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS EX PATRE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY EMADI, HIRAD; WHITE, JOHN; INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC ON 10/19/2011

OBJECTION FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 09/09/2011

OBJECTION FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 09/09/2011

OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER) FILED BY RAZAGHI, KAMBIZ ON 06/16/2011

OPPOSITION (TO DEMURRER) FILED BY RAZAGHI, KAMBIZ ON 06/16/2011

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY RAZAGHI, KAVEH ON 04/11/2011

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY RAZAGHI, KAVEH ON 04/11/2011

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 11/22/2010

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (ON AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 11/22/2010

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 11/10/2010 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 11/10/2010 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 14.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10760901 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10584793.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 14.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10760901 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10584793.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10230236 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10054111.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10230236 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10054111.

433 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12247914 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12071650.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/3/17) RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1437256 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017 06:14:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4781545 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2017 10:53:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT FILED BY CONSOLIDATED EQUITIES ON 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2586924 RECEIVED ON 08/27/2017 02:45:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CONSOLIDATED EQUITIES ON 07/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2352905 RECEIVED ON 07/21/2014 01:47:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4219332 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
638 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2009
  • REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2009 AT 03:00:00 PM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOLDEN SHIELD INVESTMENTS, INC.; HILLTOP PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, INC.; RAZAGHI, KAMBIZ; RAZAGHI, KAVEH; RIDGE MOUNTAIN, LLC; VERTEX EQUITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 02/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/05/2009 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,920.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10262883 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10086758.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10230236 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10054111.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILKINSON, RANDELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 10/23/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 10/23/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY VERONESE, PEDRO ON 10/23/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL ESCROW INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG MAURICE