This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/11/2016 at 03:29:09 (UTC).

PARK NEWPORT VS COCCOMO-CLEARY

Case Summary

On 10/20/2004 PARK NEWPORT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COCCOMO-CLEARY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4301

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK NEWPORT LTD

Defendants

KEVIN CLEARY

CATHERINE COCCOMO-CLEARY

BRANDON CLEARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL TIREY AND ST JOHN

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 09/18/2012

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 09/18/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 09/18/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 09/18/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11230958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11054850.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11230958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11054850.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 10/25/2013

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 10/25/2013

WRIT (ISSUED 04/14/14) RECEIVED ON 04/11/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 04/14/14) RECEIVED ON 04/11/2014.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 04/11/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 04/11/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11576336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11400254.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11576336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11400254.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11576336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11400254.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 04/11/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 04/14/14) RECEIVED ON 04/11/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2325560 RECEIVED ON 04/11/2014 01:52:26 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 10/25/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11230958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11054850.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 04/21/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2004
  • DocketLEGACY DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2005
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 04/21/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 04/06/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 04/04/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2005
  • DocketOTHER ACTIONS (REJECTED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 03/28/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2005
  • DocketOTHER ACTIONS (REJECTED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 02/15/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 02/08/2005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2004
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION (WRIT RETURNED) WAS FILED ON 11/17/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2004
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 10/21/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2004
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 10/20/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY PARK NEWPORT LTD ON 10/20/2004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARK NEWPORT LP is a litigant