This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/27/2016 at 04:59:40 (UTC).

PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC VS. DRINOVSKY

Case Summary

On 12/13/2005 PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DRINOVSKY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5086

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC

PALISADES COLLECTION LLC

Defendant

KRISTINE DRINOVSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MANN BRACKEN, LLP

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS & ZIDE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2015

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2015

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2015

WRIT (01/26/2015 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 01/20/2015.

WRIT (01/26/2015 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 01/20/2015.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/20/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/20/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (NON-MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/20/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (NON-MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/20/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11726041 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11550303.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11726041 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11550303.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 03/02/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 03/02/2015

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 03/02/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11726041 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11550303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (NON-MILITARY STATUS) FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (01/26/2015 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 01/20/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4311814 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2015 09:22:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3237769 RECEIVED ON 01/14/2015 07:19:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED BY WOLPOFF & ABRAMSON LLP ON 06/26/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2007
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 06/26/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY) WAS FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 03/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 03/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 03/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • SUMMONS RETURNED (SUMMONS RETURNED) WAS FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 03/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 01/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2005
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/13/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2005
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ON 12/13/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALISADES COLLECTION LLC is a litigant