This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/08/2016 at 02:40:05 (UTC).

PACKER VS. WASHINGTON

Case Summary

On 04/28/2004 PACKER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WASHINGTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2283

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUSSELL PACKER

MELANIE PACKER

Defendants

LEROY WASHINGTON

BERRIN WASHINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF TODD A. BRISCO

TODD A BRISCO

TODD A BRISCO AND ASSOCIATES, APC

Defendant Attorney

TODD A BRISCO & ASSOCIATES, APC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11971146 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11795302.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11971146 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11795302.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 5/20/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/18/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 5/20/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/18/2016.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PACKER, MELANIE; PACKER, RUSSELL ON 05/18/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PACKER, MELANIE; PACKER, RUSSELL ON 05/18/2016

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 04/13/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 04/13/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11636800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11460901.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11636800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11460901.

WRIT (ISSUED 08/04/2014) RECEIVED ON 08/01/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED 08/04/2014) RECEIVED ON 08/01/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 05/07/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 05/07/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 05/07/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 05/07/2014

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 03/15/14) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2014.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 03/15/14) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11558799 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11382704.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11558799 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11382704.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACKER, MELANIE; PACKER, RUSSELL ON 03/06/2014

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACKER, MELANIE; PACKER, RUSSELL ON 03/06/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 02/25/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 02/25/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 02/25/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 02/25/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 03/21/2013 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 03/21/2013 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION) FILED BY PACKER, MELANIE; PACKER, RUSSELL ON 12/19/2012

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION) FILED BY PACKER, MELANIE; PACKER, RUSSELL ON 12/19/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11285676 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11109

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11285676 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11109568.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (DEBTOR EXAM) SUBMITTED BY PACKER, RUSSELL REJECTED ON 12/17/2012.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (DEBTOR EXAM) SUBMITTED BY PACKER, RUSSELL REJECTED ON 12/17/2012.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 12/13/2012 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 12/13/2012 09:00:00 AM.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11971146 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11795302.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 5/20/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PACKER, MELANIE; PACKER, RUSSELL ON 05/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1322944 RECEIVED ON 05/18/2016 04:56:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 04/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11636800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11460901.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 08/04/2014) RECEIVED ON 08/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2356530 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2014 03:29:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 05/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 05/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2012
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2012 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 10/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED SETTLEMENT PER CCP 664.6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 05/24/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2004
  • WASHINGTON, LEROY REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 05/04/2004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2004
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY WASHINGTON, LEROY ON 05/04/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY WASHINGTON, LEROY ON 05/04/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • LEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY PACKER, RUSSELL; PACKER, MELANIE ON 04/28/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • LEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    Read MoreRead Less