This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/11/2016 at 05:29:55 (UTC).

PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE VS. RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 12/11/2001 PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7583

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION

Defendant

JAIME RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANK G. BLUNDO, JR. A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 09/16/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 09/16/2014

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 11/07/2013

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 11/07/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 11/07/2013 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 11/07/2013 09:30:00 AM.

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT[SHERIFF'S PACKET]) FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JAIME ON 10/09/2013

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT[SHERIFF'S PACKET]) FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JAIME ON 10/09/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11473129 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11297041.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11473129 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11297041.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 10/03/2013

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 10/03/2013

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 10/03/2013

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 10/03/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11393185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11217077.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11393185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11217077.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 06/18/13) RECEIVED ON 06/11/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 06/18/13) RECEIVED ON 06/11/2013.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 06/11/2013

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 06/11/2013

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 04/10/2012

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 04/10/2012

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 04/10/2012

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 04/10/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 03/12/2012

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 03/12/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11113235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10937127.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11113235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10937127.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 03/12/2012

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 03/12/2012

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 12/02/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 12/02/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 12/04/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 12/04/2008

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 09/16/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 11/07/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT 11/07/2013 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION (WAGE GARNISHMENT[SHERIFF'S PACKET]) FILED BY RODRIGUEZ, JAIME ON 10/09/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2013 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11473129 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11297041.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 10/03/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 10/03/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 367066 RECEIVED ON 10/03/2013 02:16:44 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/25/2008
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION - WAGE GARNISHMENT SCHEDULED FOR 01/16/2009 AT 08:30:00 AM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 12/23/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (AS TO JAIME RODRIGUEZ) FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 12/23/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10251963 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10075838.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 11/19/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2002
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2002
  • DocketCOURT ENTERS JUDGMENT FOR PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 5809.72 PRINCIPAL, 121.00 COSTS AND 640.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST RODRIGUEZ, JAIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATION - REGISTER OF ACTIONS FILED BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION ON 11/19/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE A CORPORATION is a litigant