This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/27/2016 at 11:37:10 (UTC).

OTANES VS. TORRES

Case Summary

On 01/05/2006 OTANES filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TORRES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0037

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TERESITA V OTANES

ROBERT R OTANES

Defendants

MARIA DE LA LUZ ROJAS

JOSE LUIS TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 04/07/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 04/07/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 03/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 03/18/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 02/11/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 02/11/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 01/11/2016

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 01/11/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11879958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11704149.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11879958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11704149.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 11/16/2015

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 11/16/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R ON 10/01/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R ON 10/01/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11855826 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11680073.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 142 - RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11855826 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11680073.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/1/15) RECEIVED ON 10/01/2015.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 10/1/15) RECEIVED ON 10/01/2015.

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 10/01/2015

APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 10/01/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4435280 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4435280 REJECTED.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 09/04/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 09/04/2015

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R ON 01/24/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R ON 01/24/2011

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10490257.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10490257.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 05/20/2010

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 05/20/2010

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10486578.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10486578.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT REJECTED

WRIT REJECTED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 04/07/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 03/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4519650 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2016 02:54:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 02/11/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR CONTINUED TO 04/07/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY OTANES, ROBERT R; OTANES, TERESITA V ON 01/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4487579 RECEIVED ON 01/10/2016 01:36:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 02/11/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11879958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11704149.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 03/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • WRIT ISSUED ON 03/23/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2006
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST (MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMNT,ACK. OF CREDIT,DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST) WAS FILED BY ROBERT R OTANES ON 03/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE - OTHER) WAS FILED BY ROBERT R OTANES ON 01/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ROBERT R OTANES ON 01/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED (WRIT RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED) WAS FILED ON 01/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED) WAS FILED ON 01/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2006
  • DOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED ON 01/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF APPLICATION AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D. Silverstein