This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 06:21:35 (UTC).

ORION WEBB VS. RVCA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/11/2008 ORION WEBB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RVCA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ORION WEBB

VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.

THE JAPANESE MOTORS

OLYMPIC INTERNATIONAL SECURITY, INC.

JOHN REYNOLDS

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC.

THE JAPANESE MOTORS

JOHN REYNOLDS

RVCA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

STOLPMAN KRISSMAN ELBER & SILVER LLP

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LIEBMAN, QUIGLEY, SHEPPARD & SOULEMA, APC

LAW OFFICES OF MARC JENNINGS

BURKE MOLINA CORP

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

STOLPMAN KRISSMAN ELBER & SILVER LLP

LIEBMAN, QUIGLEY, SHEPPARD & SOULEMA, APC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 10/27/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 10/27/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 10/23/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 10/23/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 07/15/2009

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 07/15/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY WEBB, ORION REJECTED ON 10/07/2009.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY WEBB, ORION REJECTED ON 10/07/2009.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY REYNOLDS, JOHN ON 10/07/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY REYNOLDS, JOHN ON 10/07/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH) FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 10/05/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH) FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 10/05/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 07/15/2009

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 07/15/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY REYNOLDS, JOHN REJECTED ON 09/28/2009.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY REYNOLDS, JOHN REJECTED ON 09/28/2009.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 09/17/2009

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 09/17/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10091759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 116126.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10091759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 116126.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 02/01/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 02/01/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/28/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/28/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/28/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/28/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10032469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 56882.

PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10032469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 56882.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

COMPLAINT FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

COMPLAINT FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 10/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 10/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 07/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY WEBB, ORION REJECTED ON 10/07/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY REYNOLDS, JOHN ON 10/07/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH) FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 10/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY VOX ENTERTAINMENT, INC. ON 07/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY REYNOLDS, JOHN REJECTED ON 09/28/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 09/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT - NO FEE FILED BY RVCA CORPORATION ON 04/10/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 27 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10091759 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 116126.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 02/01/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/28/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/28/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 320.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10032469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 56882.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WEBB, ORION ON 01/11/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VOX ENTERTAINMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIC INTERNATIONAL SECURITY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A FOREIGN INSURER is a litigant