This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/15/2016 at 04:01:13 (UTC).

ORCHARDS COMMUNITY ASSOC VS JOHN LAING HOMES

Case Summary

On 03/14/2006 ORCHARDS COMMUNITY ASSOC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against JOHN LAING HOMES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0043

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORCHARDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LAND CARE INC

JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC

PERFECT COAT INC

FORD PLASTERING INC

TOMKINS INDUSTRIES INC

OFFSITE PRODOUCTIONS INC

DOUBLE A WATERPROOFING

LORENZO AVILA

TRIMCO FINISH CARPENTRY

THORNTON STEEL INC

TRIUMPH SHEET METAL INC

WESTERN INSULATION INC

P&A TILE

HEGWER INDUSTRIES INC

LEE CONSTRUCTION

THORTON STEEL

RANCHO WEST CONCRETE

GEM CABINETS INC

UNIQUE PLASTERING INC

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG GRANT MAYFIELD KANEDA & LITT, LLP

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

GREEN & HALL, APC

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GRACE COSGROVE & SCHIRM

GREEN & HALL, APC

MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

MURCHISON & CUMMING, LLP

HOSP GILBERT BERGSTEN & PHILLIPS

WATKINS & CASAUDOUMECQ LLP

Other Attorneys

JAMPOL ZIMET SKANE & WILCOX LLP

REM CONCEPTS INC

KIRTLAND & PACKARD LLP

VAIL MACRAE & EDRINGTON

CARRICK & RAMEY LLP

LEE BAZZO & NISHI LLP

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

LAW OFFICES OF LINDA M. LIBERTUCCI

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

SPRINGEL & FINK LLP

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

LANNON & ASSOCIATES

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925293 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749185.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925293 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749185.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749183.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749183.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925288 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749180.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925288 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749180.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749173.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749173.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 09/08/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 09/08/2008 09:00:00 AM.

ORDER - OTHER (ORDER RELIEVING TRIUMPH SHEET METAL, INC. FROM APPEARING AT OSC) FILED BY TRIUMPH SHEET METAL INC ON 09/04/2008

ORDER - OTHER (ORDER RELIEVING TRIUMPH SHEET METAL, INC. FROM APPEARING AT OSC) FILED BY TRIUMPH SHEET METAL INC ON 09/04/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/04/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/04/2008 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC ON 08/06/2008

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC ON 08/06/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 5-26-06) FILED BY JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC ON 08/04/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 5-26-06) FILED BY JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC ON 08/04/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL AND SANCTIONS FOR VINTAGE DEIGN FOR FAILURE TO PAY THEIR SETTLEMENT IN FULL AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE JUNE 16 2008 OSC RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY ORCHARDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 06/18/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF OSC RE DISMISSAL AND SANCTIONS FOR VINTAGE DEIGN FOR FAILURE TO PAY THEIR SETTLEMENT IN FULL AND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE JUNE 16 2008 OSC RE DISMISSAL) FILED BY ORCHARDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 06/18/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/16/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 06/16/2008 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 04/29/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 04/29/2008

ORDER AFTER HEARING (GRANTING MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 03/10/2008

ORDER AFTER HEARING (GRANTING MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 03/10/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY VINTAGE DESIGN INC ON 02/20/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY VINTAGE DESIGN INC ON 02/20/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2008-02-07 13:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2008-02-07 13:30:00.0.

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JOANNE E SAUNDERS ESQ) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 02/05/2008

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF JOANNE E SAUNDERS ESQ) FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 02/05/2008

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 02/05/2008

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS INC ON 02/05/2008

RECOMMENDATION BY DISCOVERY REFEREE AND ORDER

RECOMMENDATION BY DISCOVERY REFEREE AND ORDER

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925293 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749185.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749183.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925289 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749181.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925288 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749180.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925286 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749178.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925284 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749176.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925281 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749173.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 21 - JURY DEPOSIT NOT USED/RETURNED IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10925279 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10749171.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL NOT DELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2008
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
328 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2006
  • AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC ON 05/31/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT (CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC ON 05/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC ON 05/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2006
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY JOHN LAING HOMES (CALIFORNIA) INC ON 05/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 04/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ORCHARDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 04/10/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 03/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ORCHARDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 03/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ORCHARDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION ON 03/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 03/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less