Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/27/2017 at 04:18:06 (UTC).

ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY VS. COMMERCIAL FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 01/05/2009 ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against COMMERCIAL FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

CARL W. BOZNANSKI

DARYLL JOHNSON

PARAGON PARTNERS

JAMES STAUDINGER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, (BNSF) SUCCESSOR

ANTHONY BUSHALA

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF TRA

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

COMMERCIAL FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

GEROGE BUSHALA

PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

DEANNA HATHAWAY, TRUSTEE OF THE HATHAWAY FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 5, 1997

DAVID SOUZA, TRUSTEE OF THE SOUZA FAMILY TRUST

JOHN HATHAWAY, TRUSTEE OF THE HATHAWAY FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 5, 1997

CORNERSTONE CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC

NOTEWORTY ADVISORS, INC.

RONALD MCMAHON, TRUSTEE OF THE ALTAMIRA FAMILY TRUST

LA JOLLA LOANS, INC. PENSION PLAN

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

WOODRUFF SPRADLIN & SMART, APC

PALMIERI TYLER WIENER WILHELM & WALDRON LLP

OLIVER SANDIFER & MURPHY

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID C. WERNER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID C. WERNER

Other Attorneys

WOODRUFF SPRADLIN & SMART

HILL FARRER & BURRILL

ROBERT BEALS

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/07/2011

STIPULATION - OTHER (FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/07/2011

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (DOE 4) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 05/17/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (DOE 4) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 05/17/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (DOE 7) FILED BY DEANNA HATHAWAY, TRUSTEE OF THE HATHAWAY FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 5, 1997 ON 05/17/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (DOE 7) FILED BY DEANNA HATHAWAY, TRUSTEE OF THE HATHAWAY FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 5, 1997 ON 05/17/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (DOE 11) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 05/17/2010

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (DOE 11) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 05/17/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BUSHALA, GEROGE ON 05/14/2010

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BUSHALA, GEROGE ON 05/14/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 03/09/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 03/09/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 03/09/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 03/09/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 02/26/2010

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON 02/26/2010

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HYC LIMITED FAMILY PARTNERSHIP ON 01/28/2010

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HYC LIMITED FAMILY PARTNERSHIP ON 01/28/2010

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEANNA HATHAWAY, TRUSTEE OF THE HATHAWAY FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 5, 1997 ON 01/28/2010

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEANNA HATHAWAY, TRUSTEE OF THE HATHAWAY FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 5, 1997 ON 01/28/2010

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE RIGHT TO TAKE TRIAL FOR 30 DAYS PURS TO CODE OF CIVIL PROC 595.2 - TRIAL IS SET FOR MARCH 29, 2010 AT 8:30AM IN DEPT CX103) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/07/2010

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE RIGHT TO TAKE TRIAL FOR 30 DAYS PURS TO CODE OF CIVIL PROC 595.2 - TRIAL IS SET FOR MARCH 29, 2010 AT 8:30AM IN DEPT CX103) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/07/2010

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 06/03/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (OF STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 06/03/2009

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 05/26/2009 02:22:46 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 05/26/2009 02:22:46 PM.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 05/13/2009

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 05/13/2009

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 05/19/2009 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 05/19/2009 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY; STAUDINGER, JAMES; JOHNSON, DARYLL; BOZNANSKI, CARL W.; PARAGON PARTNERS ON 03/30/2009

DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY; STAUDINGER, JAMES; JOHNSON, DARYLL; BOZNANSKI, CARL W.; PARAGON PARTNERS ON 03/30/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY COMMERCIAL FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/17/2009

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY COMMERCIAL FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/17/2009

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/05/2009

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/05/2009

212 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 09/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4612560 RECEIVED ON 09/28/2016 11:26:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY COMMERCIAL FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 04/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1316452 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2016 11:19:47 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/07/2011 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/01/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (AMENDED FINAL ORDER ON CONDEMNATION) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/02/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/01/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (OF ANISH BANKER RE PAYMENT OF SETTLEMENT) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/01/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 226529 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2011 01:41:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
299 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2009
  • MOTION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2009 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF DEPOSIT) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION - OTHER (FOR PREJUDGMENT ORDER OF POSSESSION) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/21/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10281175 IN THE AMOUNT OF 350.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 26 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 350.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10281175 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10105050.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MONROE, WILLIAM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 01/05/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA JOLLA LOANS, INC. PENSION PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVID SOUZA, TRUSTEE OF THE SOUZA FAMILY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where PARAGON PARTNERS LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where CORNERSTONE CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC is a litigant