This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/02/2016 at 05:36:08 (UTC).

NOVA VS PATTON

Case Summary

On 12/05/2006 NOVA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATTON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5212

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.

Defendants

ALBERT PATTON

JOHN PATTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPENCER & MULALLY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 11/25/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 11/25/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10153955 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 178321.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10153955 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 178321.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/13/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/13/2008

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (FOR ACCRUED POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST) FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/13/2008

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (FOR ACCRUED POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST) FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/13/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 05/07/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 05/07/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10046652 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 71064.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10046652 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 71064.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10046648 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 71060.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10046648 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 71060.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS, EFFECTIVE 04/01/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 11/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10153955 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 178321.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/13/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (FOR ACCRUED POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST) FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/13/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 05/07/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10046652 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 71064.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2008
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 04/25/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 03/20/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 02/20/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 02/13/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 02/02/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 01/31/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 01/29/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 12/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 12/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY NOVA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. ON 12/05/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.