Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/26/2016 at 05:59:55 (UTC).

NATIONAL V LUX

Case Summary

On 09/13/2006 NATIONAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LUX. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4172

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC

Defendant

KELLIE M LUX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORA

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF REJECTED

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF REJECTED

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 06/01/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 06/01/2009

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/17/2008

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/17/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT 11/13/2008 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT 11/13/2008 09:30:00 AM.

OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/03/2008

OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/03/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10237784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10061659.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10237784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10061659.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LUX, KELLIE M ON 10/20/2008

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LUX, KELLIE M ON 10/20/2008

MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT SCHEDULED FOR 11/13/2008 AT 09:30:00 AM IN S09 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT SCHEDULED FOR 11/13/2008 AT 09:30:00 AM IN S09 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 33 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 33 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

MOTION TO SET ASIDE FILED BY LUX, KELLIE M ON 10/14/2008

MOTION TO SET ASIDE FILED BY LUX, KELLIE M ON 10/14/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 10/02/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 10/02/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10087306 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 111673.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10087306 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 111673.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 04/01/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 04/01/2008

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 06/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT 11/13/2008 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION (TO MOTION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT) FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/03/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR FACSIMILE FILING PER PAGE IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10237784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10061659.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY LUX, KELLIE M ON 10/20/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT SCHEDULED FOR 11/13/2008 AT 09:30:00 AM IN S09 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 33 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2006
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK - LIMITED CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 11/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 10/11/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 09/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 09/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC ON 09/13/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS LLC is a litigant