This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/18/2016 at 03:00:11 (UTC).

NATIONAL V DRASKOVIC

Case Summary

On 06/20/2006 NATIONAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DRASKOVIC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2643

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFO

NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

SASA D DRASKOVIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN J PUGH

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/25/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/25/2008

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10070379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 94764.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10070379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 94764.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/05/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/05/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 10/20/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 10/20/2008

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/08/2009

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/08/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/08/2009

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/08/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/10/2011

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/10/2011

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/10/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 10/20/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 05/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10070379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 94764.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2008
  • WRIT ISSUED FOR ORANGE COUNTY AGAINST DEFENDANT, SASA D DRASKOVIC AKA SASA DRASKOVIC AKA DRASKOVIC SASA AKA SARA PRASKOVIC AKA SASA SASA DRASKOVIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2007
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 03/07/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2006
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2006
  • REQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST - OTHER) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/14/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF CMC HEARING) WAS FILED ON 11/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 08/16/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 07/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY NATIONAL CREDIT ACEPTANCE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 06/20/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL CREDIT ACCEPTANCE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J. PUGH - JOHN J. PUGH