Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/17/2016 at 06:22:43 (UTC).

NAKAMOTO VS TRAN

Case Summary

On 05/18/2006 NAKAMOTO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2766

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANCIS NAKAMOTO

AMY NAKAMOTO

Defendants

LONNIE LE

TAM TRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARIA MAHECHA

Defendant Attorney

REX L BRADY

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/19/2012 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/19/2012 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11019143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10843035.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11019143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10843035.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 10/26/2011

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 10/26/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 10/26/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 10/26/2011

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 11/30/2009

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 11/30/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS; NAKAMOTO, AMY ON 07/01/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS; NAKAMOTO, AMY ON 07/01/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 02/03/2009

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 02/03/2009

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10239309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10063184.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 42 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10239309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10063184.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 10/30/2008

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - OR GREATER FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 10/30/2008

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 10/30/2008

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 10/30/2008

REJECTED WRIT OF EXECUTION.

REJECTED WRIT OF EXECUTION.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS; NAKAMOTO, AMY ON 01/29/2008

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS; NAKAMOTO, AMY ON 01/29/2008

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2012
  • TRANSFER OF WEST JUSTICE CENTER CASE TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER - ADMIN ORDER 12/7, EFFECTIVE 10/01/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/19/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11019143 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10843035.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 01/19/2012 AT 08:30:00 AM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 10/26/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 10/26/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 11/30/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS; NAKAMOTO, AMY ON 07/01/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY NAKAMOTO, FRANCIS ON 02/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2006
  • OTHER ACTIONS (REJECTED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 06/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM (AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM) WAS FILED BY FRANCIS NAKAMOTO ON 06/08/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 06/06/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2006
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS (ORDER FEE WAIVER GRANTED) WAS FILED BY LONNIE LE ON 06/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2006
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY LONNIE LE ON 06/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNDOCUMENTED ACTION) WAS FILED ON 05/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2006
  • NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED) WAS FILED ON 05/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 05/18/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REX L BRADY