This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 10:29:37 (UTC).

MITCHELL V CR COMPUTING

Case Summary

On 01/31/2007 MITCHELL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CR COMPUTING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Laguna Hills located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0555

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY

Defendants

CARPARTS TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

CR COMPUTING SOLUTIONS, INC

AFTERSOLF NETWORK NA INC., SUCCESSOR TO CARPARTS TECHNOLOGIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, BERGER: A LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2013
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2007
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (FULL ACKNOWLEDGE OF SATIS JUDGMENT) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 10/30/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2007
  • DocketDOCUMENT - OTHER (SPECIAL FILING SEE REMARKS) WAS FILED ON 10/24/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2007
  • DocketAPPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR HEARD ON 10/24/2007 AT 08:30:00 IN HLH AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2007
  • DocketMINUTES GENERATED (OFF CALENDAR - MISC) ON 10/24/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 10/23/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2007
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 10/16/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 10/12/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 10/10/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 09/21/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2007
  • DocketREQUEST - OTHER (REQUEST - OTHER) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 05/14/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2007
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 05/04/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2007
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT) WAS FILED ON 04/18/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2007
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL W/O PREJUDICE) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 04/06/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 03/13/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 02/09/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 02/09/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (COMPLAINT - LIMITED) WAS FILED BY MITCHELL LAND AND IMPROVEMENT COMPANY ON 01/31/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED ON 01/31/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 01/31/2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less