This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/29/2016 at 06:24:44 (UTC).

MILTON VS KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2006 MILTON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME GREATER LOS ANGELES INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0231

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVILDA GODFREY BELL

ALLEN BROOKS

VERONICA LEDESMA

CHINYERE OBAKHUME

SEAN FARRIS

JOSE LEDESMA

ANTHONY MILTON

ANTONIO BACA

CHARLTON DE-ARMAN SIMPSON

HERBERT BELL

MARIAN MARTINEZ

SHAIBU OBAKHUME

JEFF GLICK

YVONNE DOYLE

LONNIE NICHOLSON

CHRISTINA BACA

HALETHA BROOKS

GINA GLICK

PAMELA FARRIS

Cross Defendant

FIRE SPRINKLER SYSTEMS INC

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT CLAUSEN

Cross Defendant Attorney

MCMAHON LAW FIRM INC

Other Attorneys

BOHL & ASSOCIATES

GRAVES AND KING LLP

BONETATI SASAKI KINCAID & KINCAID INC

MICHELMAN & ROBINSON, LLP

STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ

HINES SMITH CARDER DINCEL BLAND

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & OMEARA LLP

BAUER ANDERSON LLP

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT LLP

ANDREWS & RHODES LLP

BOHL NIXON & SCHONEMAN

LAW OFFICE OF KEVIN PEGAN

LEE GODDARD & DUFFY LLP

THOMPSON, TIMOTHY N.: LAW OFFICES OF

MCCOLLOCH & CAMPITIELLO LLP

LORBER GREENFIELD & POLITO LLP

SUSSON PARRETT & ODELL

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 03/06/2009 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 03/06/2009 09:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 11-30-06) FILED BY KB HOME ON 02/20/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 11-30-06) FILED BY KB HOME ON 02/20/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 02/20/2009

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 02/20/2009

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY SANTANA CONCRETE INC ON 11/12/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) FILED BY SANTANA CONCRETE INC ON 11/12/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10-2-07) FILED BY M&L METAL MASTERS ON 10/16/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10-2-07) FILED BY M&L METAL MASTERS ON 10/16/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 7-11-07) FILED BY EXECUTIVE PLUMBING INC ON 10/14/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 7-11-07) FILED BY EXECUTIVE PLUMBING INC ON 10/14/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE 10/10/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE 10/10/2008 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2008-08-01 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 2008-08-01 09:00:00.0.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 07/29/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 07/29/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 07/29/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 07/29/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SANTANA CONCRETE ON 07/24/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY SANTANA CONCRETE ON 07/24/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY STEVE SMART ENTERPRISES INC ON 07/03/2008

ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY STEVE SMART ENTERPRISES INC ON 07/03/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 06/24/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 06/24/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 06/04/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 06/04/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY PREFERRED FRAMING INC ON 05/20/2008

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY PREFERRED FRAMING INC ON 05/20/2008

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2008-05-09 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 2008-05-09 09:00:00.0.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 03/11/2008

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY KB HOME ON 03/11/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY KB HOME ON 02/14/2008

NOTICE - OTHER (OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY KB HOME ON 02/14/2008

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 04/03/2009 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • COURT ORDERED ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PACIFIC COAST DRYWALL INC ON 03/20/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 8-8-07) FILED BY PACIFIC COAST DRYWALL INC ON 03/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SANTANA CONCRETE ON 03/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY SANTANA CONCRETE INC ON 03/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 03/06/2009 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
285 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2006
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ANTHONY MILTON ON 12/01/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY KB HOME ON 11/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT (CROSS-COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY KB HOME ON 11/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2006
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (ANSWER/GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT/PETITION) WAS FILED BY KB HOME ON 11/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) WAS FILED BY ANTHONY MILTON ON 11/21/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2007
  • MINUTES GENERATED (ORDER - MINUTE ORDER) ON 11/15/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • ORDER - OTHER (ORDER - OTHER) WAS FILED ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • COMPLAINT (COMPLAINT) WAS FILED BY ANTHONY MILTON ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED) WAS FILED BY ANTHONY MILTON ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2006
  • CASE HAS BEEN INITIATED ON 11/02/2006

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.